California Northern District Court
Judge:Jacqueline Scott Corley
Case #: 3:24-cv-02609
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Case in other court:Alameda County Superior Court, 23CV057114
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 1:22 AM PDT
Defendant
Sussex Publishers, LLC
Represented By
Matthew D. Pearson
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Monique G. Matar
Baker & Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
D.G.
Represented By
Scot Bernstein
Law Offices Of Scot D. Bernstein
contact info
Eric A. Grover
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Donald Wayne Bivens
contact info
Plaintiff
R.C.
Represented By
Scot Bernstein
Law Offices Of Scot D. Bernstein
contact info
Eric A. Grover
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Rachael Ga-Yue Jung
Keller Grover LLP
contact info
Donald Wayne Bivens
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
57 57 30+ pgs motion Dismiss Thu 05/08 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES filed by Sussex Publishers, LLC. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 6/26/2025 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 08, 19th Floor. Responses due by 5/22/2025. Replies due by 5/29/2025.(Pearson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order