Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Mary S Scriven
Referred: Thomas G Wilson
Case #: 8:24-cv-01042
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 12, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 11:07 PM EDT
Defendant
Secretary, Department of Corrections
Plaintiff
Elena Erickson
Represented By
George Edward Reres
Rereslaw, Llc.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 12/11 1:58 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL George of Local Rule 2.02(a), which states, "The first paper filed on behalf of a party must designate only one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action." Counsel must file a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation identifying lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Tue 12/10 3:00 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL George E. Reres of Local Rule 2.01(b)(2)(B), which requires members of the Middle District bar to maintain with the clerk a current telephone number, mailing address, and email address. Update your contact information for the Middle District through PACER. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MLB)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of change of address Mon 12/09 10:23 AM
NOTICE of change of address by George Edward Reres Related [+]
Related: [-] res, George
Monday, July 22, 2024
10 10 4 pgs respoth Response Mon 07/22 5:37 PM
RESPONSE re9 Response to habeas petition by Elena Erickson. Related [+]
Related: [-] res, George
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
9 9 6 pgs answer Response to habeas petition Wed 07/10 9:38 AM
Limited RESPONSE to 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus /Motion to Dismiss Petition as Untimely by Secretary, Department of Corrections.(Horbelt, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Exhibit List,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-18
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of appearance Tue 05/07 8:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sonya Roebuck Horbelt on behalf of Secretary, Department of Corrections (Horbelt, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order to respond to habeas petition Mon 05/06 2:38 PM
ORDER to respond and show cause why the petition should not be granted. Respondent has 90 days to respond. Petitioner has 30 days to reply to the petition response. Clerk is directed to serve the petition. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/6/2024.(TDC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service Documents
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 05/02 5:53 PM
ORDER granting 3 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/2/2024. (Wilson, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
5 5 transfer Division transfer in Wed 05/01 10:21 AM
TRANSFER IN from Ocala Division on 04/30/2024 Case Number 5:24-cv-182-SDM-PRL. Case assigned to District Judge Scriven and Magistrate Judge Wilson. New Case Number: 8:24-cv-1042-MSS-TGW. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. (AJS) Modified on 5/1/2024 to edit docket text (AJS).
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
4 4 ORDER transferring case to Middle District of Florida, Tampa Division. The Clerk must forward the action and close this case. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 4/30/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
3 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Elena Erickson. Related [+] (KLS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens.
Related: [-] res, George
2 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. New case number: 5:24-cv-182-SDM-PRL. (AA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
1 1 First PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - Federal filed by Elena Erickson. Related [+] Modified PDF correction and text on 4/15/2024 (KLS).
Related: [-] res, George
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet