New Jersey District Court
Judge:Jamel K Semper
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:24-cv-05753
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Oct 27, 2024 5:18 AM EDT
Defendant
JANE DOE
Defendant
JOHN DOE
Defendant
JENNIFER EDWARDS
Defendant
VICTORIA GRAY
Defendant
DEVANG MERCHANT
Defendant
JEANNE E MOSS
Defendant
NEW JERSEY CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Defendant
NJ DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION
Defendant
EDWARD RUSSO
Defendant
UNION COUNTY NEW JERSEY PROBATION DEPARTMENT
Defendant
UNION COUNTY NJ CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT
Plaintiff
DAVID MOSS
206 RIVERSIDE DR
SPOKANE, WA 99281


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 04/25 4:28 PM
ORDER granting Defendants'10 Letter request to stay discovery pending adjudication of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 4/25/2025. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference Tue 04/29 5:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer: Status Conference held on 4/23/2025. (ECR) (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
12 12 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 3:06 PM
PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS (mxw, ) Related [+]
Related: [-] ceived via ADS
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
11 11 order Order Wed 03/26 9:47 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed Mr. Stockton's March 25, 2025 letter request [D.E. 10] that the Court stay discovery pending adjudication of the motion to dismiss based on, among other things, sovereign immunity and subject matter jurisdiction. The conference scheduled for April 23rd will proceed as scheduled. However, the purpose of the conference will be to discuss whether to stay this litigation. Accordingly, the parties are not required to submit a joint discovery plan prior to the conference. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/26/2025. (Hammer, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Tue 03/25 12:06 AM
Letter from Jacob N. Stockton, Esq.. (STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
9 9 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 03/20 1:49 PM
TEXT ORDER: There will be a Virtual Scheduling Conference on 4/23/2025 at 12:30 p.m. before the Undersigned. The Court will provide the parties with a Teams' link in advance of the conference. The parties shall file a joint discovery plan by 4/16/2025. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 3/20/2025. (jqb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/19 12:37 PM
Set Deadlines as to8 First MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of answer . Motion set for 3/17/2025 before Judge Jamel K. Semper. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
8 8 motion Dismiss Tue 02/18 6:19 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss in lieu of answer by JENNIFER EDWARDS, VICTORIA GRAY, DEVANG MERCHANT, NEW JERSEY CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT, NJ DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, EDWARD RUSSO, UNION COUNTY NEW JERSEY PROBATION DEPARTMENT, UNION COUNTY NJ CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT. Responses due by 3/17/2025.(STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 8 Brief
Monday, December 23, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Mon 12/23 10:14 AM
LETTER ORDER granting6 Defendants' Request that they be permitted to respond to the Complaint within sixty (60) days from the waiver of service, as provided by Fed R. Civ. P. 4(d). Defendants' response to the Complaint will be due on or before 2/18/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer on 12/23/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Fri 12/20 5:16 PM
Letter from Defendants, State of New Jersey Judiciary, Probation Services Division, Child Support Enforcement Unit; the Superior Court of New Jersey, Union Vicinage, Probation Division; Devang Merchant, Trial Court Administrator of the Union Vicinage; Jennifer L. Edwards, Vicinage Chief Probation Officer of the Union Vicinage; Victoria Gray, Vicinage Assistant Chief Probation Officer of the Union Vicinage; and Edward Russo, a former Union Vicinage employee waiving service pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 4(d). (STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/20 5:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by JACOB NICKLESS STOCKTON on behalf of UNION COUNTY NEW JERSEY PROBATION DEPARTMENT, JENNIFER EDWARDS, EDWARD RUSSO, VICTORIA GRAY, DEVANG MERCHANT, NJ DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, NEW JERSEY CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT, UNION COUNTY NJ CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT (STOCKTON, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
4 4 misc Letter: re USM 285 Wed 12/11 4:04 PM
Letter: re USM-285 Form. Refer to the[LINK:USM Forms Page] for the USM-285 Form and a sample USM-285 Form. (dam)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Granting/Denying In Forma Pauperis Wed 12/11 4:00 PM
ORDER granting1 -2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed IFP; directing the Clerk of the Court to file the Complaint; directing the Clerk to issue summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint, summons and this order upon the Defendants as directed by the Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Jamel K. Semper on 12/11/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
cmp Complaint Wed 12/11 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT, see ECF No.1 , against JANE DOE, JANE DOE, JANE DOE, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, JOHN DOE, JENNIFER EDWARDS, VICTORIA GRAY, DEVANG MERCHANT, JEANNE E MOSS, NEW JERSEY CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT, NJ DEPARTMENT OF PROBATION, EDWARD RUSSO, UNION COUNTY NEW JERSEY PROBATION DEPARTMENT, UNION COUNTY NJ CHILD SUPPORT ENFORCEMENT with JURY DEMAND filed by DAVID MOSS. (dam)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
2 2 notice Notice of Guidelines for Pro Se Filers Wed 05/01 11:18 AM
Notice of Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
1 1 service Complaint Received Wed 05/01 11:17 AM
Complaint Received. (mj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Application IFP,
Att: 3 Proposed IFP Order,
Att: 4 Consent for Electronic Communication,
Att: 5 Envelope