Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Audrey G Fleissig
Case #: 4:24-cv-00617
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Monday Oct 28, 2024 3:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Thomas Davis
4878 Pescadero Ave, Unit 103
San Diego, CA 92107
Represented By
Daisy Manning
Husch Blackwell Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr.
Husch Blackwell Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Stephen P. Bosco
Husch Blackwell Llp - Dc
contact info
Plaintiff
Perimeter Solutions LP
8000 Maryland Ave, Suite 350
Clayton, MO 63105
Represented By
Keith Driscoll
Harness Ip - Troy
contact info
Douglas A. Robinson
Harness Dickey Plc - St. Louis
contact info
Bryan K. Wheelock
Harness Dickey Plc - St. Louis
contact info

GPO Sep 06 2024
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. 24. The dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking to pursue its claims against Defendant in its case pending in the Eastern District of California. A separate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/2024. (CLT)

Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
39 39 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Fri 09/06 1:27 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Pursuant to the Memorandum and Order issued herein on this day, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking to pursue its claims against Defendant in its case pending in the Eastern District of California. Pursuant to Local Rule 13.05, Section B(2), if a party wishes for any documents previously filed under seal to remain sealed, a Motion to Continue Sealing must be filed in this case within 90 days following the final disposition of the litigation. 60-Day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 11/5/2024 90-day Reminder for LR 13.05 Unsealing 12/5/2024 Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/2024. (CLT)
Related: [-]
38 38 18 pgs order Memorandum & Order Fri 09/06 1:22 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED.24 . The dismissal is without prejudice to Plaintiff seeking to pursue its claims against Defendant in its case pending in the Eastern District of California. A separate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/6/2024. (CLT)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
37 37 order A Docket Text Order Fri 08/30 10:14 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keith P. Driscoll by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/30/2024. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
36 36 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 08/29 4:47 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Keith P. Driscoll. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10795998) by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP.(Driscoll, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Monday, August 12, 2024
35 35 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 08/12 2:10 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Daisy Manning for Defendant Thomas Davis. (Manning, Daisy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 08/09 4:09 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Thomas Davis. (Telscher, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
33 33 order A Docket Text Order Thu 08/01 1:56 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:32 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Stephen P. Bosco filed by Thomas Davis; ORDERED GRANTED.31 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion until and including August 9, 2024 filed by Thomas Davis ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/1/24. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
32 32 motion Withdraw as Attorney/Firm Wed 07/31 1:46 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Stephen P. Bosco by Defendant Thomas Davis. (Bosco, Stephen)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/31 1:41 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to30 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion until and including August 9, 2024 by Defendant Thomas Davis. (Bosco, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
30 30 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/24 6:19 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
29 29 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Mon 07/15 8:23 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:28 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Perimeter Solutions LP ; ORDERED GRANTED ( Response to Court due by 7/24/2024.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/15/24. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 07/12 9:36 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
27 27 order A Docket Text Order Mon 07/08 12:39 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen P. Bosco filed by Thomas Davis ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/8/24. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
26 26 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/05 3:35 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Stephen P. Bosco. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10695571) by Defendant Thomas Davis.(Bosco, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing DC Bosco Certificate of Good Standing 2024.06.13
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
25 25 21 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 07/03 3:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Thomas Davis.(Telscher, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of R. Telscher,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - E.D. Cal. Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - US Pat No. 6395200,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - US Pat No. 10550483,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - US Pat No. 11420084
24 24 motion Dismiss (other than a party or the case) Wed 07/03 3:26 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant Thomas Davis. (Telscher, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
23 23 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Thu 05/30 11:41 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:22 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint filed by Perimeter Solutions LP ; ORDERED GRANTED. (Thomas Davis answer due 7/3/2024.) Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/30/24. (KJS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 05/29 9:12 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re14 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
21 21 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 05/23 1:30 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas Davis. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Telscher, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 05/23 1:26 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Rudolph A. Telscher, Jr for Defendant Thomas Davis. (Telscher, Rudolph)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
19 19 misc Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF) Mon 05/20 3:26 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT re 11 Docket Text Order, 4 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, 14 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP . (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Sealed Document (no service occurs via CM/ECF) Mon 05/20 3:24 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT re 11 Docket Text Order, 4 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal, 14 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP . (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Filing Exhibit Mon 05/20 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Filing Exhibit with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP re14 Amended Complaint :(Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Safety Data Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - redacted Agreement,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Fortress Announcement,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - redacted Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Letter,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Compass Press Release,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - QPL List
Thursday, May 16, 2024
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/16 9:26 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Perimeter Solutions LP. Thomas Davis served on 5/10/2024, answer due 5/31/2024. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 05/14 3:34 PM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perimeter Solutions LP, Perimeter Solutions Inc., Perimeter Solutions LLC.. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/14 3:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Thomas Davis Amendment to1 Complaint, , filed by Perimeter Solutions LP. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Perimeter Solutions LP.(Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 05/08 8:39 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan K. Wheelock for Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Wheelock, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Tue 05/07 3:08 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within seven (7) days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file: (1) an amended complaint that alleges facts establishing the citizenship of each party; and (2) an amended Disclosure Statement that fully complies with Local Rule 2.09, as set forth above. If Plaintiff fails to timely and fully comply with this Order, the Court will conclude that it lacks diversity jurisdiction over Plaintiffs state-law claims and will instead exercise only supplemental jurisdiction over those claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367. Related [+] Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/7/2024. (CBL)
Related: [-] sponse to Court due by 5/14/2024.
Monday, May 06, 2024
11 11 order A Docket Text Order Mon 05/06 12:45 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:3 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. ORDERED: GRANTED. Signed by Sr. District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/6/2024. (CBL)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Redacted Document Mon 05/06 11:02 AM
REDACTION to4 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,1 Complaint, Redacted Exhibit E by Perimeter Solutions LP filed by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Redacted Document Mon 05/06 10:59 AM
REDACTION to4 Sealed Memorandum in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal,1 Complaint, Redacted Exhibit C by Perimeter Solutions LP filed by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
misc Case Opening Notification Fri 05/03 9:30 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Douglas A. Robinson. (JBH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
8 8 service Notice of Process Server Thu 05/02 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP Process Server: Proof Serve (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Thu 05/02 11:09 AM
AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perimeter Solutions LP, Perimeter Solutions Inc., Perimeter Solutions LLC.. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (CSCI) Thu 05/02 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Thu 05/02 7:26 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re2 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not signed by filing attorney. Signed Disclosure Statement must be filed. (CBL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 respm Sealed Memo in Support of Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Wed 05/01 11:42 PM
SEALED MEMORANDUM in Support of 3 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal filed by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. Redacted Copy due by 5/6/2024.(Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C,
Att: 2 Exhibit E
3 3 motion Leave to File Under Seal Wed 05/01 11:40 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Perimeter Solutions LP. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Wed 05/01 11:34 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Perimeter Solutions LP, Perimeter Solutions Inc., Perimeter Solutions LLC.. (Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 05/01 11:30 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Thomas Davis with receipt number AMOEDC-10580482, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Perimeter Solutions LP.(Robinson, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Safety Data Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit D - Fortress Announcement,
Att: 4 Exhibit F - Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit G - Press Release,
Att: 6 Exhibit H - QPL List,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 8 Original Filing Form,
Att: 9 Summons