Colorado District Court
Judge:Lewis T Babcock
Case #: 1:24-cv-01193
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241st - Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Case Filed:Apr 29, 2024
Terminated:Jun 27, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, September 09, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Tue 09/10 12:15 PM
MINUTE ORDER. On July 31, 2024, Applicant filed a letter requesting "the status of the "Minute Order" entered on July 5, 2024. (See ECF No.15 ). The request is granted. Applicant is advised that a new civil action, No. 24-cv-02169-RTG was opened, and that on August 6, 2024, Mr. Simmington was ordered to cure filing deficiencies within thirty days in the new action, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/9/2024.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
15 15 4 pgs motion Order Mon 08/05 11:07 AM
LETTER Requesting Status re:14 Minute Order, by Petitioner David W Simmington, Jr. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Fri 07/05 1:53 PM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5 July 2024. It has come to the Court's attention that Applicant's Petition Against Judicial Impropriety (ECF No.13 ) was inadvertently filed in this action instead of being used to initiate a new action. Thus, the Clerk of the Court is directed to use ECF No. 13 as an initiating document to commence a new civil right action under 42 U.S.C. § 1983.(cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 06/28 2:45 PM
ORDER. Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No.9 ) is accepted and adopted. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. The Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this dismissal would not be taken in good faith. Any pending motions are denied as moot, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/27/2024.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Judgment ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Fri 06/28 2:54 PM
JUDGMENT by Clerk re:11 Order on Report and Recommendations on 6/27/2024. (angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
13 13 9 pgs motion Order Tue 07/02 9:08 AM
Petition Against Judicial Impropriety by Petitioner David W Simmington, Jr. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
10 10 respoth Objection to Report and Recommendations Tue 06/25 11:00 AM
OBJECTION to9 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge filed by Petitioner David W Simmington, Jr. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 motion Report and Recommendations Mon 06/10 2:24 PM
RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 10 June 2024. RECOMMENDED that the Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2241 (ECF No.1 ) be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to Younger v. Harris, 401 U.S. 37 (1971). (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/07 10:47 AM
ORDER OF REFERENCE TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7 June 2024. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Fri 06/07 10:35 AM
Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 6 June 2024. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge. (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
6 6 8 pgs misc Response to Order to Show Cause Fri 05/31 8:08 AM
RESPONSE TO5 ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE by Petitioner David W Simmington, Jr. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order to Show Cause Wed 05/08 11:35 AM
ORDER DIRECTING PETITIONER TO SHOW CAUSE. It is ORDERED that Mr. Simmington shall show cause, in writing, within thirty (30) days, why this habeas action should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to the doctrine of Younger abstention. If Mr. Simmington fails to show cause within the time allowed, this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/7/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/01 4:18 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 5/1/2024.(angar, )
Related: [-]
Monday, April 29, 2024
3 3 misc Case Assigned to Judge Wed 05/01 8:34 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 05/01 8:32 AM
Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner David W Simmington, Jr. (blaws)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Wed 05/01 8:28 AM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 USC § 2241, filed by David W Simmington, Jr. (blaws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope