Florida Southern District Court
Case #: 0:24-mj-06209
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 3:27 AM EDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
M. Catherine Koontz
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (1)
Terminated: 04/30/2024
Represented By
Noticing FPD-FTL
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:23 PM EDT
Monday, April 29, 2024
Arrest of Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (at)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Set Hearing as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley: Initial Appearance - Rule 5(c)(3)/40 set for 4/30/2024 11:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before FTL Duty Magistrate Judge. (at)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs Magistrate Judge Removal of Indictment and Arrest Warrant from DISTRICT OF NORTH DAKOTA (FARGO DIVISION) Case number in the other District 3:24-CR-00064-PDW as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (1). (at)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3)/Rule 40 Proceedings as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley held on 4/30/2024. Defendant waives Identity/Preliminary Hearing, and Detention Hearing in this District, see Waiver. All further proceedings to be held in the District of North Dakota. Attorney added: Noticing FPD-FTL for Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (Digital 11:28:47) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/30/2024). (at)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley. (at)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs ORDER granting 3 Motion to Unseal Case as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/30/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs WAIVER OF RULE 5 & 5.1 REMOVAL/IDENTITY HEARINGS by Kashiem Jeffery Lashley (at)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley. Defendant committed to DISTRICT OF NORTH DAKOTA. Closing Case for Defendant. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Panayotta D. Augustin-Birch on 4/30/2024). (See attached document for full details). (at)
Related: [-]
7 7 14 pgs Notice of Criminal Transfer to DISTRICT OF NORTH DAKOTA (FARGO DIVISION) of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Kashiem Jeffery Lashley. Your case number is: 3:24-CR-00064-PDW. Docket sheet and documents attached. If you require certified copies of any documents, please call our Records Section at 305-523-5210. Attention Receiving Court : If you wish to designate a different email address for future transfers, send your request to TXND at: InterDistrictTransfer_TXND@txnd.uscourts.gov. (at)
Related: [-]