Rhode Island District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00038
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday May 02, 2024 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
William Michael Dickson (1)
Represented By
Kevin J. Fitzgerald
Federal Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Julie M. White
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2024 3:51 AM EDT
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
Arrest of William Michael Dickson (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan:Initial Appearance as to William Michael Dickson held on 4/10/2024, Bond Hearing as to William Michael Dickson held on 4/10/2024. Julie White for the government; Kevin Fitzgerald for the defendant; Christina Woishnis for probation. Court informs defendant of his rights and appoints FPD on his behalf; Court informs defendant of pending charges and potential penalties; Court schedules preliminary hearing for 4/26/2024 at 2:00 pm; Court enters Due Process Protections Act order; Both sides request release; Court orders defendant released on $10,000.00 Unsecured Bond with conditions; Defendant released.(Court Reporter FTR Recording in Courtroom B at 1:14.)(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to William Michael Dickson. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to William Michael Dickson (1).(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Affidavit,
Att: 2 Criminal Cover Sheet
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to William Michael Dickson Kevin J. Fitzgerald for William Michael Dickson appointed.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/10/2024. (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER PURSUANT TO DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT as to William Michael Dickson. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/10/2024. (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
6 6 Appearance Bond Entered as to William Michael Dickson in amount of $ 10,000.00 Unsecured. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/10/2024.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to William Michael Dickson (1) $10,000.00 Unsecured Bond with conditions. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/10/2024.(Saucier, Martha) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/11/2024) (Saucier, Martha). [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
8 8 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 4/10/2024. in case as to William Michael Dickson. (Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 25, 2024
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion to Continue Preliminary Hearing as to William Michael Dickson (1). So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan on 4/25/2024.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
HEARING CANCELLED re Preliminary Hearing set for 4/26/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan as to William Michael Dickson has been cancelled. Court to reschedule.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to William Michael Dickson. Preliminary Hearing set for 5/10/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. Moved from 4/26/2024.(Saucier, Martha) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION to Continue by William Michael Dickson. Responses due by 5/9/2024. (Fitzgerald, Kevin) [1:24-mj-00023-PAS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
NOTICE OF FORFEITURE ALLEGATION by USA as to William Michael Dickson re10 Indictment.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT REQUEST as to William Michael Dickson. Arraignment set for 5/10/2024 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom B before Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. This hearing replaces the preliminary exam hearing previously scheduled. (Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
10 10 3 pgs INDICTMENT as to William Michael Dickson (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3.(Noel, Jeannine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet