Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-41956

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Mark A Randon
Case #: 2:24-ap-04126
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Brandon Heitmann
60749 Forest Creek Dr
Washington Twp., MI 48094
Represented By
Brandon Heitmann
contact info
Defendant
Amanda Pisarski
60749 Forest Creek Dr
Washington, MI 48094
Represented By
Amanda Pisarski
contact info
Defendant
Henry Bell
198 S. Main St., Suite 2
Mt. Clemens, MI 48043
Represented By
Henry Bell
contact info
Defendant
Construction Contractors, LLC
198 S. Main St., Suite 2
Mt. Clemens, MI 48043
Represented By
Construction Contractors, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Explore Industries, USA, Inc.
Cambridge Center, 38777 Six Mile Road Suite 300
Livonia, MI 48152
Represented By
Explore Industries, USA, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Carter
30500 Van Dyke Avenue, Ste. 200
Warren, MI 48093
Represented By
Daniel Carter
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, October 14, 2024
36 36 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/14 2:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 35 Request to be Removed from Receiving Notices of Electronic Filings in a Adversary Case
35 35 notice Req to be Removed from Receiving Electronic Filings in a Case Mon 10/14 2:15 PM
Request to be Removed from Receiving Notices of Electronic Filings in a Adversary Case for Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc.. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
34 34 order Remand Tue 09/10 10:02 AM
Order Granting Motion For Remand and Limited Relief from the Automatic Stay Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 23
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Tue 09/10 10:11 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on September 10, 2024 by the United States Postal Service to the Macomb County Circuit Court, Attn: Clerk of Court, 40 N. Main St., Mt. Clemens, MI 48043 Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 34 Order on Motion For Remand
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 09/10 10:13 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4126 : Remanded. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 09/10 10:14 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4126 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
33 33 audio . Mon 09/09 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/9/2024 2:06:16 PM ]. File Size [ 20032 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:41:44 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Motion Granted Mon 09/09 3:11 PM
Minute Entry. Motion Granted. Related [+] (Binion, L)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter
Monday, August 12, 2024
32 32 misc Certificate of Service Mon 08/12 3:22 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 31 Concurrence
31 31 misc Concurrence Mon 08/12 3:19 PM
Concurrence and Joinder in Heitmann Opposition to Motion for Remand Filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand to Macomb County Circuit Court
Friday, August 09, 2024
30 30 answer Objection Fri 08/09 1:09 PM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand to Macomb County Circuit Court
29 29 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Fri 08/09 11:10 AM
Notice of Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 9/9/2024 at 02:00 PM Courtroom 1825, 211 W. Fort St. for23 , (Binion, L) EFFECTIVE: JANUARY 1, 2024. Note: Judge Randon is conducting all conferences and non-evidentiary hearings by telephone. At least five minutes prior to scheduled time for hearing, counsel and parties should call (202)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter
Thursday, August 08, 2024
28 28 answer Objection Thu 08/08 11:37 AM
Objection to Related [+] Filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand to Macomb County Circuit Court
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
27 27 misc Exhibit Wed 07/24 7:39 PM
Exhibit Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter. (Harrington, John)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Wed 07/24 7:34 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter. (Harrington, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Tue 07/23 12:27 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Missing or Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 7/30/2024. (Binion, L)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter,24 Notice and Opportunity for Hearing filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter
Monday, July 22, 2024
24 24 notice Notice and Opportunity for Hearing 21 day Mon 07/22 3:07 PM
Notice and Opportunity to Respond/Object; Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter Related [+]. Response due by 8/12/2024. (Harrington, John)
Related: [-] 23 Motion for Remand
23 23 motion Remand Mon 07/22 3:06 PM
Motion for Remand to Macomb County Circuit Court Filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter (Harrington, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
22 22 order stipulated order Thu 06/13 1:53 PM
Order Extending Time for Parties to File Motion to Remand Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann
Saturday, June 08, 2024
21 21 misc Stipulation Sat 06/08 11:05 AM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff and all Defendants Re: in support of proposed Order Extending Time to File Motion for Remand . Filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann. (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 06/08 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Thursday, June 06, 2024
19 19 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/06 10:45 AM
Certificate of Service re service of Appearance of Nicholas Tatro Filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc. Related [+]. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-] 18 Deficiency Notice (BK)
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
18 18 court Deficiency Notice (BK) Wed 06/05 11:14 AM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 6/12/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc.
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 06/04 2:20 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Explore Industries, USA, Inc.. (Tatro, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 05/23 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Deficiency Notice
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
15 15 order Striking Document (text) Tue 05/21 8:56 AM
Order of the Court to Strike: This pleading is stricken from the record because the PDF has been filed in the incorrect case-- (*Note-PDF Attached re: Adv 24-4125 Related [+]. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Mark A. Randon (Binion, L)
Related: [-] Concurrence8 Concurrence filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski
Monday, May 20, 2024
14 14 audio . Mon 05/20 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/20/2024 2:09:37 PM ]. File Size [ 5536 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:32 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order order (Generic) Mon 05/20 4:48 PM
Order Regarding Status Conference . (KEC)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Concurrence Mon 05/20 4:02 PM
Concurrence / STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO ENTRY OF FINAL ORDERS OR JUDGMENTS BY THE BANKRUPTCY COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9027(E)(3) Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski. (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/20 4:00 PM
Corrected Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski. (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Mon 05/20 1:33 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 5/28/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski,9 Concurrence filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski
9 9 misc Concurrence Mon 05/20 10:56 AM
Concurrence / CORRECTED STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO ENTRY OF FINAL ORDERS OR JUDGMENTS BY THE BANKRUPTCY COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF BANKRUPTCY PROCEDURE 9027(E)(3) Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski Related [+]. (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-] 8 Concurrence
8 8 misc Concurrence Mon 05/20 9:39 AM
Concurrence / Statement of Consent to Entry of Final Orders or Judgments by the Bankrupcty Court Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9027(E)(3) Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski. (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 05/20 9:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Amanda Pisarski. (Phillips, Tyler)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Status Conference Held Mon 05/20 2:30 PM
Minute Entry. Status Conference Held. Related [+] (Binion, L)
Related: [-] 3 Order To Set Hearing
Sunday, May 19, 2024
6 6 misc Concurrence Sun 05/19 10:58 AM
Concurrence [DEFENDANT BRANDON HEITMANNS STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO ENTRY OF FINAL ORDERS OR JUDGMENTS BY THE BANKRUPTCY COURT] Filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann Related [+]. (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
5 5 misc Exhibit Sun 05/19 10:26 AM
Exhibit 1. Register of Actions as of 5.17.2024. 2. Carter Complaint 3. Brandon Heitmann Answer 4. Amanda Pisarski Answer Filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann Related [+]. (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Sunday, May 12, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Sun 05/12 11:20 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Brandon Heitmann Related [+]. (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 order Set Hearing Mon 05/06 11:32 AM
Order Scheduling Status Conference In Removed Proceeding . Status Conference to be held on 5/20/2024 at 02:00 PM Courtroom 1825, 211 W. Fort St. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Mon 05/06 3:31 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 5/6/24 by the United States Postal Service to the following parties: Daniel Carter at c/o John Harrington 30500 Van Dyke Ave Ste 200 Warren MI 48093, Amanda Pisarski at 60749 Forest Creek Dr Washington, MI 48094, Henry Bell and Construction Contractors LLC at c/o Goran Antovski 198 S. Main St., Suite 2 Mt. Clemens, MI 48043, and Explore Industries, USA, Inc. c/o Nicholas Tatro Cambridge Center 38777 Six Mile Road Suite 300 Livonia, MI 48152 . Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 3 Order To Set Hearing
Friday, May 03, 2024
2 2 court Deficiency Notice (AP) Fri 05/03 1:45 PM
Notice of Deficient Pleading: Proof of Service Non-Compliant. Related [+] Proof of Service Due on 5/10/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Daniel Carter
Thursday, May 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 05/02 7:50 AM
Adversary case 24-04126 (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)): Notice of Removal by Defendant Brandon Heitmann, Amanda Pisarski, Henry Bell, Construction Contractors, LLC, Explore Industries, USA, Inc.. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00 (Bassel, Robert)
Related: [-]