Maryland District Court
Judge:Julie Rebecca Rubin
Referred: J Mark Coulson
Case #: 1:24-cv-01303
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Oct 18, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Anna's of Lakeland, LLC
Plaintiff
Pandora Jewelry, LLC
250 Pratt Street
Baltimore, MD 21201
Represented By
Peter Christopher Nanov
Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease LLP
contact info

GPO Sep 25 2024
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/25/2024. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, October 18, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Report and Recommendations Fri 10/18 8:38 AM
ORDER granting9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment; adopting in whole13 Report and Recommendations; entering Default Judgment in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 10/18/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
13 13 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 09/25 4:19 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/25/2024. (bg3s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
12 12 misc Supplement Tue 09/10 5:06 PM
Supplement to9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC Supplemental Certificate of Service for Motion for Default Judgment(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
order Order Tue 09/10 4:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to supplement its Motion for Default Judgment (ECF No.9 ) confirming that the Motion was served upon Defendant's registered agent and was not returned as undeliverable. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 9/10/2024. (ols, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 08/08 4:09 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson for Report and Recommendation re:9 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Julie Rebecca Rubin on 8/8/2024. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
9 9 motion Default - Judgment Tue 07/23 12:48 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC by Pandora Jewelry, LLC(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Michelle Bender,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration,
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
8 8 misc Mail Returned Tue 07/09 12:08 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Anna's Lakeland, LLC. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Page of Returned Document
Friday, June 21, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Default Fri 06/21 1:48 PM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC (c/m 6/21/24) (yks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Clerks Entry of Default Fri 06/21 1:46 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC (c/m 6/21/24) (yks, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
5 5 motion Default - Clerk's Entry of Wed 05/29 3:26 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Pandora Jewelry, LLC(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 05/29 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC. Anna's of Lakeland, LLC served on 5/7/2024, answer due 5/28/2024.(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/03 11:52 AM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Anna's of Lakeland, LLC.(ar6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
2 2 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 05/02 4:29 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pandora Jewelry, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Pandora Jewelry Inc., Corporate Parent Pandora A/S for Pandora Jewelry, LLC.(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 4:21 PM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Anna's of Lakeland, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMDDC-11241001.), filed by Pandora Jewelry, LLC.(Nanov, Peter)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons