Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Bridget Meehan Brennan
Referred: James E Grimes Jr
Case #: 5:24-cv-00792
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Shelly Company
Represented By
Jeffrey S. Hiller
Littler Mendelson - Columbus
contact info
Andrew J. Klaben-Finegold
Littler Mendelson - Columbus
contact info
Defendant
William Zvorack
Plaintiff
Tina Davis Myers
3676 Powers Way
Youngstown, OH 44502


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
28 28 minutes Status Conference Tue 04/15 3:35 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Status Conference held on 04/15/2025. Present were pro se Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers and counsel for Defendant Shelly Company, Jeffrey S. Hiller. The parties advised that they have exchanged previously outstanding information, and that depositions were taken. The parties will not be using experts in this case. The dispositive motion deadline remains June 27, 2025. The Court encouraged the parties to continue to consider engaging in mediation, and to notify the Court if at any time they would like to do so. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 04/15/2025. (Time: 5 minutes) (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 04/15 3:36 PM
Copy of28 Minutes of Status Conference mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Deposition (court event) Tue 03/18 2:45 PM
Notice of Deposition Pursuant To Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) of on filed by Tina Davis Myers. (D,Th)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
26 26 order Minute Order _ Status Conference Wed 03/12 3:44 PM
Minutes of Proceeding and Order of Status Conference held on 03/12/2025. Present were pro se Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers and counsel for Defendant Shelly Company, Jeffrey S. Hiller. The parties provided an update on the status of the case and advised that Plaintiff will take her depositions on April 4. The Court set the following, additional deadlines, that by March 25, Plaintiff must tell defense counsel whether any of her medical providers will be fact witnesses or expert witnesses; by March 19, Plaintiff must tell defense counsel the name of her phone carrier; the Court will hold a status conference by video on April 15 at 2:00 pm. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 03/12/2025. Time: 15 minutes (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 03/12 3:45 PM
Copy of26 Minute Order of Status Conference mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/19 12:16 PM
Order: The parties' request to extend the fact discovery cutoff date to April 25, 2025 is granted, with the understanding that further extensions will not be permitted absent good cause. The Court expects the parties to promptly communicate with one another to schedule their depositions. A follow-up status conference by video is set for March 12, 2025 at 2:00 p.m., by which time the parties are expected to have made significant progress scheduling, if not conducting, their depositions. Zoom instructions for the call will be separately provided. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/19/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Minute Order _ Status Conference Wed 02/19 12:14 PM
Minute Order of Status Conference held on 02/18/2025. Present were pro se Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers and counsel for Defendant Shelly Company, Andrew J. Klaben-Finegold and Jeffrey S. Hiller.The parties jointly requested a 60-day extension of the fact discovery cutoff date, until April 25, 2025. An Order will follow. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 02/19/2025. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 02/19 12:17 PM
Copy of24 Minute Order of Status Conference and25 Order mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Deposition (court event) Tue 02/18 1:28 PM
Notice of Deposition Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 30(B)(6) filed by Tina Davis Myers. (P,R)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
order Order on Motion to dismiss party Fri 12/13 2:43 PM
Order [non-document]: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's motion to dismiss the claims against Defendant William D. Dvorak. (Doc.22 ). Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 21, Plaintiff's motion is GRANTED and Defendant William D. Dvorak is dismissed from this action. IT IS SO ORDERED. Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 12/13/24.(T,A)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
22 22 motion Dismiss Party Mon 12/09 3:50 PM
Motion to dismiss complaint against defendant William D. Dvorak only filed by Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers. Related document(s)1 .(B,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
order Order Wed 11/20 1:45 PM
Order: [non-document] By December 4, Plaintiff Davis Myers must provide the Court with proof of service on William Zvorack at his home address that issued on August 21, 2024. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 11/20/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 11/20 1:49 PM
Copy of 11/20/2024 non-document Order mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
21 21 service Return of Service Executed Wed 11/20 9:51 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Shelly Company on 6/12/2024, filed on behalf of Tina Davis Myers. Related document(s)4 . (S,DA)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Return of Service Executed Wed 11/20 9:46 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon William Zvorack on 6/12/2024, filed on behalf of Tina Davis Myers. Related document(s)4 . (S,DA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
19 19 order Protective Order Tue 10/22 10:13 AM
Stipulated Protective Order regarding confidential documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 10/22/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 10/22 10:15 AM
Copy of19 Protective Order mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way, Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
18 18 oth_doc Proposed Order Mon 10/21 4:30 PM
Proposed Order Stipulated Protective Order filed by Shelly Company. (Hiller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
order Order Wed 10/16 2:34 PM
Order: [non-document] The parties were to file a proposed stipulated protective order consistent with Appendix L to the Local Rules for the Northern District of Ohio by October 11, 2024. See Doc.14 , at 3; Doc.16 , at 4. The parties are to file their proposed stipulated protective order by October 21. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 10/16/2024. (D,I)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 10/16 2:36 PM
Copy of non-document order dated 10/16/24 mailed to Tina Davis Myers 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502 on 10/16/2024. (D,I)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (atty event) Mon 10/07 3:49 PM
Joint Notice filed by Shelly Company. Related document(s)15 .(Hiller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
16 16 order Case Management Conference Plan/Order Thu 09/26 4:39 PM
Case Management Conference Plan/Order. Case is assigned to the standard track. Cut-off date to add parties or amend pleadings: October 26, 2024. Cut-off date for fact discovery: February 26, 2025. Expert reports for party with burden of proof due: March 28, 2025. Rebuttal expert reports due: April 28, 2025. Cut-off for expert discovery: May 28, 2025. Dispositive motion deadline: June 27, 2025. Oppositions to motions due: 30 days later. Replies due: 14 days later. Status video conference: February 18, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 09/26/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
15 15 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 09/26 4:35 PM
Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. Case Management Conference held on 09/26/2024. Present were pro se Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers and counsel for Defendant Shelly Company, Andrew J. Klaben- Finegold and Jeffrey S. Hiller. After discussion, the Court provided the parties with Case Management dates. The parties expressed an interest in mediation. By October 7, the parties will file a notice on the docket indicating (1) whether they are interested in private mediation or Court-facilitated mediation and (2) how soon they wish to mediate. The Court encourages the parties to engage in early mediation in the hopes that they can settle this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 09/26/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 09/26 4:40 PM
Copy of15 Case Management Conference and16 Case Management Conference Plan/Order mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way, Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
14 14 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting (atty event) Mon 09/09 5:55 PM
Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Shelly Company. Related document(s)11 .(Klaben-Finegold, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 oth_evt Summons Issued Wed 08/21 3:04 PM
Original Summons and Complaint issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon William Zvorack. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM-285
12 12 motion Leave Wed 08/21 11:39 AM
Motion for leave to plead, Instanter filed by Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers. Related document(s)1 ,10 .(D,Ju)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Amended Complaint
order Order on Motion for leave Wed 08/21 1:50 PM
Order [non-document] Plaintiff's motion for leave, with new summons for Defendant Zvorack, Doc.12 , is granted. Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 08/21/2024.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 order Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Tue 08/20 2:40 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 09/26/2024 at 2:00 PM by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. See Order for details (Attachment 1: Report of Parties' Planning Meeting). Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 08/20/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Tue 08/20 2:41 PM
Copy of11 Case Management Conference Scheduling Order and Zoom link mailed to Tina Davis Myers, at 3676 Powers Way, Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
10 10 3 pgs order Order Thu 08/01 2:39 PM
Order If Plaintiff fails to serve Defendant Zvorack by August 29, 2024, or show good cause for her failure, the Court will dismiss without prejudice Zvorack from this case. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 08/01/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 08/01 2:40 PM
Copy of10 Order, mailed to Tina Davis Myers, at 3676 Powers Way, Youngstown, OH, 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 9:31 AM
Order . Plaintiff must provide the Court with a corrected summons for service on Zvorack at an appropriate address. Myers must provide her corrected summons to the Court within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 07/03/2024. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Wed 07/03 9:31 AM
Copy of9 Order mailed to Tina Davis Myers, 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Service (atty event) Tue 07/02 5:52 PM
Notice of Service of Defendant The Shelly Companys Answer to Plaintiffs Complaint for Employment Discrimination and Defendants Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Shelly Company. Related document(s)7 ,6 .(Hiller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 07/01 4:42 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent CRH PLC, Other Affiliate CRH North America Limited, Other Affiliate Oldcastle Finance Inc., Other Affiliate Oldcastle Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate The Shelly Holding Company, Other Affiliate CRH Americas Materials, Inc., Other Affiliate CRH Americas, Inc. for Shelly Company filed by Shelly Company. (Hiller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/01 4:36 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, filed by Shelly Company. (Hiller, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order of Referral Fri 05/31 9:54 AM
Order referring case to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. for general pretrial supervision pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and Local Rules 72.1 and 72.2(a). Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan on 5/31/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
4 4 oth_evt Summons Issued Fri 05/31 9:30 AM
Original Summons and Complaint issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Shelly Company and William Zvorack.. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 USM-285
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Fri 05/31 10:27 AM
Copy of5 Order of Referral mailed to Tina Davis Myers at 3676 Powers Way, Youngstown, OH 44502 on 5/31/2024. (H,Ch)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis Thu 05/09 4:00 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes Jr. on 05/09/24.(M,MT)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Remark re Pro Se Service Thu 05/09 4:01 PM
Copy of3 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Tina Davis Myers 3676 Powers Way Youngstown, OH 44502. (M,MT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 05/03 9:18 AM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Tina Davis Myers. Related document(s)1 . (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 4:29 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Shelly Company and William Zvorack. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Tina Davis Myers. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - EEOC Initial Charge,
Att: 4 Exhibit D EEOC Amended Charge,
Att: 5 Summons Summons - both for Shelly Company,
Att: 6 Waiver of Service - both for Shelly Company,
Att: 7 Envelope
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 05/03 8:22 AM
Judge Bridget Meehan Brennan assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 05/03 9:13 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Grimes, Jr. (E,CK)
Related: [-]