Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Henry Edward Autrey
Case #: 4:24-cv-00620
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:53 AM CDT
Counter Claimant
Staples Promotional Products
Represented By
Alexander James Lindley
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Peter Corsale
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Brian E. McGovern
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Counter Defendant
Stars Design Group, Inc.
Represented By
Zachary Robert McMichael
Capes Sokol PC
contact info
Amy L. Fehr
Capes Sokol PC
contact info
Karl Borgsmiller
Capes Sokol PC
contact info
Defendant
Jeff A. Back
1029 Woodgate Drive
Kirkwood, MO 63122
Represented By
Alexander James Lindley
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Peter Corsale
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Brian E. McGovern
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Defendant
Staples Promotional Products
a division of Staples Contract and Commercial, Inc. 221 Bolivar Street
Jefferson City, MO 65101
Represented By
Alexander James Lindley
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Peter Corsale
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Brian E. McGovern
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Defendant
Sun Coast Merchandise Corporation
117 S. Lexington Street
Harrisonville, MO 64701
Represented By
Alexander James Lindley
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Peter Corsale
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Brian E. McGovern
Mccarthy Leonard Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Stars Design Group, Inc.
8182 Maryland Avenue, 15th Floor
St. Louis, MO 63105
Represented By
Zachary Robert McMichael
Capes Sokol PC
contact info
Amy L. Fehr
Capes Sokol PC
contact info
Karl Borgsmiller
Capes Sokol PC
contact info

GPO May 14 2024
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, [Doc. No. 9], is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 05/14/2024. (ANR)
GPO Jul 11 2024
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that on Defendants' Motion to Quash, [Doc. No. 45], is granted. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 7/11/2024. (JEB)

Docket last updated: 05/07/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, December 20, 2024
76 76 order A Docket Text Order Fri 12/20 10:33 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:51 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Jeff A. Back, Staples Promotional Products, Sun Coast Merchandise Corporation, Counter Claimant Staples Promotional Products; ORDERED DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/19/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
75 75 order A Docket Text Order Thu 12/19 1:14 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:74 STIPULATION re 73 Order, Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Stars Design Group, Inc; SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/19/2024. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
74 74 misc Stipulation Tue 12/17 12:24 PM
STIPULATION re73 Order, Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice by Plaintiff Stars Design Group, Inc.. (Fehr, Amy)
Related: [-]