Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:24-cv-00541
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:09 AM CDT
Defendant
City of Brentwood
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Benjamin C. Allen
Farrar & Bates, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Estate of Kimberly Helper
Represented By
Mary Elizabeth McCullohs
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Mary Katherine Evins
Represented By
Mary Elizabeth McCullohs
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Tracy Hetzel
Represented By
Amber L. Barker
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Jason Robert Trautwein
Office Of Tennessee Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
David O'Neill
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Benjamin C. Allen
Farrar & Bates, L.L.P.
contact info
Defendant
Lori Russ
Represented By
Cassandra M. Crane
Farrar Bates Berexa
contact info
Benjamin C. Allen
Farrar & Bates, L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wendy Hancock
Represented By
Larry Lamont Crain
Crain Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Lorraine Wade
Wade Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Connie Reguli
Represented By
Larry Lamont Crain
Crain Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Lorraine Wade
Wade Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
35 35 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 07/17 6:25 PM
REPLY to Response to re26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tracy Hetzel. (Barker, Amber)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 07/11 12:36 PM
ORDER granting32 Joint Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 7/11/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
33 33 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 07/10 12:11 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of32 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Joint Motion and Memorandum to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant Hetzel's Motion to Dismiss filed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli Plaintiffs' Joint Memorandum in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant Tracy Hetzel's Motion to Dismiss . (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion File Excess Pages Wed 07/10 12:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Plaintiffs' Joint Motion and Memorandum to File Excess Pages for Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Response in Opposition to Defendant Hetzel's Motion to Dismiss by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 07/10 12:01 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Joint Response in Opposition to Defendant Tracy Hetzel's Motion to Dismiss filed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
30 30 24 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 07/08 10:19 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of29 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiffs' Joint Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Estate of Kimberly Helper and Mary Katherine Evins . (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 07/08 10:16 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiffs' Joint Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Estate of Kimberly Helper and Mary Katherine Evins filed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 07/03 8:07 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jacobs Masters Gilbert admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
28 28 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 07/02 4:50 PM
ANSWER OF DEFENDANTS LORI RUSS, DAVID ONEIL, AND THE CITY OF BRENTWOOD, TENNESSEE ANSWER to Complaint by City of Brentwood.(Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
27 27 21 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Thu 06/27 3:37 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of26 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Tracy Hetzel . (Barker, Amber)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Dismiss Thu 06/27 3:34 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Tracy Hetzel. (Barker, Amber)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/27 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jacobs Masters Gilbert on behalf of Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins (Gilbert, Jacobs)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 24, 2024
24 24 14 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 06/24 3:45 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of23 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins . (McCullohs, Mary)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 06/24 3:44 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins. (McCullohs, Mary)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 05/24 8:45 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Jason Robert Trautwein admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 05/23 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Robert Trautwein on behalf of Tracy Hetzel (Trautwein, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 21, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 05/21 4:56 PM
ORDER: Motion20 for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint GRANTED. Extension to 6/27/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 05/21/24. (ad)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 05/21 2:12 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Tracy Hetzel. (Barker, Amber) Modified on 5/21/2024 (ad)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/21 12:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amber L. Barker on behalf of Tracy Hetzel (Barker, Amber)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 05/20 10:28 AM
ORDER granting17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by City of Brentwood, David O'Neill. City of Brentwood answer due 7/2/2024; David O'Neill answer due 7/2/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/20/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Mon 05/20 12:05 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Cassandra M. Crane, Benjamin C. Allen admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
17 17 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 05/17 3:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by City of Brentwood, David O'Neill. (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 3:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin C. Allen on behalf of City of Brentwood, David O'Neill, Lori Russ (Allen, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/17 3:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cassandra M. Crane on behalf of City of Brentwood, David O'Neill, Lori Russ (Crane, Cassandra)
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 05/17 9:51 AM
ORDER granting13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, filed by Mary Katherine Evins, Estate of Kimberly Helper. Estate of Kimberly Helper answer due 6/24/2024; Mary Katherine Evins answer due 6/24/2024. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 5/16/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 05/16 1:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins. (McCullohs, Mary)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
misc Annotation - Bar Status Wed 05/15 3:34 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Mary Elizabeth McCullohs admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/14 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Elizabeth McCullohs on behalf of Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins (McCullohs, Mary)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/09 3:59 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. Tracy Hetzel served on 5/7/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/09 3:58 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. City of Brentwood served on 5/3/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/09 3:57 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. David O'Neill served on 5/3/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/09 3:55 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. Mary Katherine Evins served on 5/3/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 05/09 3:53 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. Estate of Kimberly Helper served on 5/3/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 05/09 3:51 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli. Lori Russ waiver sent on 5/3/2024. (Crain, Larry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 05/02 12:49 PM
Summons issued as to City of Brentwood, Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins, Tracy Hetzel, David O'Neill, Lori Russ. Service packet returned to counsel by regular mail. (kc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Thu 05/02 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference is set for 11/4/2024 at 03:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (kc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Thu 05/02 12:32 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Thu 05/02 12:31 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Thu 05/02 12:33 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Larry Lamont Crain, Lorraine Wade admitted to this court . (kc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
1 1 77 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Brentwood, Estate of Kimberly Helper, Mary Katherine Evins, Tracy Hetzel, David O'Neill, Lori Russ (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4069515), filed by Wendy Hancock, Connie Reguli.(kc) Modified on 5/2/2024 (kc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Indictment July 2019,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 Excerpt from Transcript 5 17-2021
Att: 3 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet