Butler v. Lee et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Referred: | Brian W Mckay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01060 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 01, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jun 15, 2024 6:38 AM CDT |
Defendant
City of Cleburne Texas
|
|
Defendant
Cleburne Police Department
|
|
Defendant
Brian Davenport
|
|
Defendant
Bryan Scott Lee
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr
1107 Tanglewood Drive
Cleburne, TX 76033 |
Docket last updated: 09/19/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
68 | 68
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/19 9:02 AM
Notice of letter from Attorney General of Texas filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) Modified text on 9/19/2024 (agc) |
|
67 | 67
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/19 8:12 AM
Affidavit of Ronnie Wayne Butler JR filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) (Main Document 67 replaced to correct image on 9/19/2024) (agc). Modified text on 9/19/2024 (agc) |
|
Att: 1 Additional Page(s) Incident report provided by police officer Bryan Scott Lee and Brian Davenport, in support that Internal investigator Kasey Cowell fabricated information in his internal affairs investigation report. | ||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
66 | 66
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Tue 09/17 11:18 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to25 Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
65 | 65
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Tue 09/17 8:44 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to64 Additional Attachments to Main Document by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
64 | 64
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Mon 09/16 2:05 PM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to63 Response/Objection by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
63 | 63
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 09/16 9:39 AM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr re:3 Complaint,, (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
Saturday, September 14, 2024 | ||
62 | 62
respm
Response/Objection
Sat 09/14 12:35 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr re:4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis,13 Additional Attachments to Main Document (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
61 | 61
respm
Response/Objection
Fri 09/13 12:15 PM
RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr re:25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Butler, Ronnie) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
60 | 60
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Thu 09/12 10:18 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to49 Affidavit, by Plaintiff Ronnie Wayne Butler, Jr. (Butler, Ronnie) |