Arizona District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00740
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 12:42 AM MST
Defendant
Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar (1)
Represented By
Carlos Anthony Brown
Carlos A Brown PLLC
contact info
Mark Thomas Rumold
Federal Public Defenders Office - Phoenix
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brandon Marcellus Brown
Us Attorneys Office - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:51 AM MST
Thursday, April 04, 2024
Arrest of Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar on 4/4/2024. (AO) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar. (AO) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 08, 2024
2 2 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine: Initial Appearance as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar held on 4/8/2024. FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT TAKEN. IT IS ORDERED appointing AFPD Mark Thomas Rumold for Defendant. Preliminary Hearing requested. Request GRANTED as set forth below. Detention Hearing submitted. Defendant ordered detained pending trial as a flight risk and a danger. SPANISH Interpreter required for Defendant. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Thomas Simon for AUSA Brandon Brown for the Government, AFPD Mark Rumold for Defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Spanish Interpreter Patrick Brandlin assists Defendant. Preliminary Hearing set for 4/15/2024 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 305, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett. Related [+] Hearing held 3:15 PM to 3:19 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (SST) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
3 3 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar. (SST) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine. (SST) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar. Signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah M Fine on 4/9/2024.(AO) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
7 7 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett: Preliminary Hearing as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar held on 4/15/2024. Witness for the Government, FBI Special Agent Holly Riley, is placed under oath and examined. Argument heard. IT IS ORDERED taking the matter UNDER ADVISEMENT. Appearances : AUSA Brandon Brown for the Government, AFPD Mark Rumold for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody, assisted by Spanish Interpreter Susana Carman. Related [+] Hearing held 2:00 PM to 2:37 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-] corded by COURTSMART.
8 8 MINUTE ORDER as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar re: Preliminary Hearing held on 4/15/2024: The Court has considered the testimony of FBI Special Agent Riley, the charging document, and argument of counsel. The Court finds that the Government has met its burden of proof. Probable cause exists that the crime the defendant was charged with was committed and the defendant committed the crime. ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett on 4/15/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MRH) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
9 9 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to attorney Mark Rumold by Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar.(Rumold, Mark) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 ORDER as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar: IT IS ORDERED granting the Defendant's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record9 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mark Rumold, Assistant Federal Public Defender, is withdrawn and Carlos Brown, CJA Panel Attorney, is appointed as counsel of record for Defendant Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar for all further proceedings, effective immediately. The Court finds one day excludable delay under 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h). Signed by Magistrate Judge Eileen S Willett on 4/19/2024. (CSL) [2:24-mj-06159-ASB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
11 11 INDICTMENT Related [+] as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3 with Forfeiture Allegations. Arraignment set for 5/8/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 303, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Alison S Bachus. (KLG)
Related: [-] dacted for Public Disclosure
12 12 DOJ CONFLICT MEMO. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Camille D Bibles. No probable conflict re Judge Dominic W Lanza. No probable conflict re Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Filed by USA as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar. (KLG)
Related: [-]
14 14 SEALED UNREDACTED INDICTMENT as to Jorge Guadalupe Fong Salazar. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Case Summary