California Central District Court
Case #: 5:24-mj-00193
Case Filed:Apr 30, 2024
Terminated:Apr 30, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 12:22 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
US Attorney's Office
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Maryliza Velasquez (1)
Terminated: 04/30/2024
Represented By
Mariah C. Holder
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:17 AM PDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Notice to District of Utah of a Rule 5 or Rule 32 Initial Appearance as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez. The clerk will transmit any restricted documents via email. Using your PACER account, you may retrieve the docket sheet and any text-only entries via the case number link. The following document link(s) is also provided:10 Warrant of Removal and Commitment to Another District. If you require certified copies of any documents, please send a request to email address CrimIntakeCourtDocs-LA@cacd.uscourts.gov (mhe)
Related: [-]
1 1 AFFIDAVIT RE: OUT-OF-DISTRICT WARRANT (Rule 5(c)(3)) filed as to defendant Maryliza Velasquez, originating in the District of Utah. Defendant charged in violation of: 18:3583. Signed by agent Cesar Perez, USMS,DEO. USA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
2 2 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez; defendants Year of Birth: 1987; date of arrest: 4/30/2024 (mhe)
Related: [-]
3 3 SEALED Defendant Maryliza Velasquez arrested on warrant issued by the USDC District of Utah at Salt Lake City.(mhe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Charging Documents
4 4 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR DETENTION filed by Plaintiff USA as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez (mhe)
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES OF ARREST ON OUT OF DISTRICT WARRANT held before Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez. Court issues Order under Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f) concerning prosecutor's disclosure obligations; see General Order 21-02 (written order). Defendant arraigned and states true name is as charged. Attorney: Mariah C. Holder for Maryliza Velasquez, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present. Defendant remanded to the custody or currently in the custody of the US Marshal. Court orders defendant held to answer to District of Utah. Warrant of Removal and final commitment to issue. Court Smart: CS RS No 4. (mhe)
Related: [-]
6 6 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (mhe)
Related: [-]
7 7 ADVISEMENT OF STATUTORY & CONSTITUTIONAL RIGHTS filed by Defendant Maryliza Velasquez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER OF RIGHTS approved by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez. (mhe)
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani as to Defendant Maryliza Velasquez, (mhe)
Related: [-]
10 10 WARRANT OF REMOVAL AND COMMITMENT by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani that Defendant Maryliza Velasquez be removed to the District of Utah (mhe)
Related: [-]