Tennessee Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-20067
Case Filed:May 01, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 2:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Dwezkita Robinson (1)
Represented By
Tyrone Jemal Paylor
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Lauren Joanna Delery
Office Of The United States Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 3:13 AM CDT
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
1 1 INFORMATION as to Dwezkita Robinson (1) count(s) 1. (wrh)
Related: [-]
2 2 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Dwezkita Robinson (wrh)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr.: Change of Plea Hearing as to Dwezkita Robinson held on 5/1/2024. Defendant present in court with counsel & sworn. Plea colloquy/Basis in fact by the Government. Waiver of Indictment filed in open court. Oral plea presented in open court. Guilty Plea entered as to Count 1 of the Criminal Information. Guilty plea accepted. Case 2:22-cr-20225 to be dismissed at sentencing. Sentencing set for Thursday, 08/29/2024 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr. Order of Detention entered. Defendant remanded to USM. (AUSA: Lauren Delery)(Defense: Tyrone Paylor) (Court Reporter Lashawn Marshall.) (wrh)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Dwezkita Robinson. Signed by Judge John Thomas Fowlkes, Jr. on 05/01/2024. (Fowlkes, John)
Related: [-]
5 5 SETTING LETTER as to Dwezkita Robinson: [TEXT ONLY - NO IMAGE ATTACHED] Sentencing set for Thursday, 8/29/2024 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis before Judge John Thomas Fowlkes Jr. (wrh)
Related: [-]