Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00120
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 3:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Joseph Oloyede (1)
Represented By
David E. Johnson
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Cleveland
contact info
Cal Cumpstone
Marein & Bradley
contact info
Michael I. Marein
Marein & Bradley
contact info
Defendant
Edward Oluwasanmi (2)
Represented By
Henry J. Hilow
Law Office Of Henry Hilow
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
James L. Morford
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Edward D. Brydle
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info

GPO Apr 24 2025
Report and Recommendation on Plea of Guilty as to Joseph Oloyede (1). Objections to Report & Recommendation due by 5/8/2025. Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd on 4/24/2025. (D,JJ)
GPO Apr 30 2025
Order Adopting Report and Recommendation 41 as to Joseph Oloyede (1) on Plea of Guilty. Judge Christopher A. Boyko on 4/30/2025. (L,Ja)

Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 3:50 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Criminal Rule 57.9. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (L,MI)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs UNSEALED INDICTMENT filed by USA as to Joseph Oloyede (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, 7-10, 13, Edward Oluwasanmi (2) count(s) 1, 3-6, 8, 11-12. (L,MI). Modified on 4/5/2024 to unseal (H,SP).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Designation Form and Signature Page
4 4 Motion to Seal Indictment filed by United States of America as to Joseph Oloyede (1), Edward Oluwasanmi (2). (L,MI)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order granting the government's4 Motion to Seal indictment until the arrest of any Defendant as to Joseph Oloyede (1), Edward Oluwasanmi (2). Magistrate Judge Jennifer Dowdell Armstrong on 4/3/2024. (L,MI)
Related: [-]