California Northern District Court
Judge:Haywood S Gilliam, Jr
Case #: 4:24-cv-02025
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Apr 03, 2024
Terminated:Sep 17, 2024
Last checked: Monday Sep 30, 2024 1:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Effectus Group, LLC
Represented By
Alfredo William Amoedo
Haynes & Boone, LLP
contact info
Thomas Edward Moore, III
Haynes & Boone, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Barbara Cray
Law Offices of Barbara Cray 303 Twin Dolphin Dr., 6th Fl.
Redwood Shores, CA 94065
Plaintiff
Federal Insurance Company
202B Hall's Mill Road
Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889
Represented By
Katherine Cullen McBroom
Kaedian LLP
contact info
Andrew George Hunt
De Luca Levine LLC
contact info
Henry Louis Whitehead
Kaedian LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 02 2024
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/2/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2024; Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/8/2024; Opening Reports due by 11/22/2024; Rebuttal Reports due by 12/20/2024; Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/13/2025; Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (3-day) set for 6/16/2025 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2024)
GPO Jul 02 2024
**DISREGARD, ORDER E-FILED IN THE WRONG CASE.**ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 18 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2024) Modified on 7/8/2024 (ndr, COURT STAFF).

Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
32 32 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Tue 09/17 7:47 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Effectus Group, LLC. (Amoedo, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 09/17 9:14 AM
***Civil Case TERMINATED, See Docket No.32 .*** (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
31 31 adr ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Mediator Mon 07/29 12:16 PM
ADR Clerk's Notice Appointing Barbara Cray as Mediator. (af, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
30 30 order ~Util - Terminate Motions Order Referring Case to Mediation ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 07/08 12:25 PM
ORDER GRANTING 28 STIPULATION Selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/8/2024. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
29 29 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Mon 07/08 12:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO.28 . All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-02025-HSG as previously advised via docket no. 15 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Mediation Mon 07/08 11:40 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Federal Insurance Company filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Mediation Mon 07/08 12:50 PM
CASE REFERRED to Mediation. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
27 27 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines Wed 07/03 7:58 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr.: Initial Case Management Conference held via Zoom on 7/2/2024. Total Time in Court: 6 minutes. Not Reported. Plaintiff Attorney: Andrew Hunt. Defendant Attorney: Thomas Moore, III. Court-connected mediation with a 90-day deadline is discussed. The parties are directed to meet and confer and e-file within one week from today (July 9, 2024) a stipulation and proposed order selecting an ADR process and deadline. Scheduling order to issue with a June 2025 trial date. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/2/2024)
Related: [-]
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation selecting Private ADR Tue 07/02 3:27 PM
ORDER by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. GRANTING 18 Stipulation Selecting Private ADR. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 07/02 3:25 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 7/2/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2024; Close of Fact Discovery due by 11/8/2024; Opening Reports due by 11/22/2024; Rebuttal Reports due by 12/20/2024; Close of Expert Discovery due by 1/13/2025; Motion Hearing set for 2/27/2025 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2025 03:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. Jury Selection / Jury Trial (3-day) set for 6/16/2025 08:30 AM in Oakland, Courtroom 2, 4th Floor before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam Jr. (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Private ADR Tue 07/02 3:31 PM
CASE REFERRED to Private ADR. (cmf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
24 24 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 06/25 2:06 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Effectus Group, LLC (Amoedo, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Joint Case Management Statement Tue 06/25 9:26 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Certificate/Proof of Service Tue 06/25 7:09 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Federal Insurance Company for Judges Procedures (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 06/21 6:15 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Federal Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chubb Limited, Corporate Parent Chubb INA Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Chubb Group Holdings Inc. for Federal Insurance Company. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 06/14 9:08 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by Effectus Group, LLC. (Amoedo, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
19 19 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Thu 06/13 10:25 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE DOCKET NO. 15 . Notice is hereby given that the case management conference, previously set for July 2, 2024 will be held on that day before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. via a Zoom webinar instead of by phone. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
18 18 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR Tue 06/11 5:54 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Private ADR by Federal Insurance Company filed by Federal Insurance Company. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
17 17 adr ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options Tue 06/11 5:54 AM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 20, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation without Proposed Order Mon 05/20 5:45 PM
STIPULATION To Extend Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Effectus Group, LLC. (Amoedo, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Clerk's Notice ~Util - Telephonic Hearing (AT&T) Thu 05/02 3:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A TELEPHONIC CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Telephonic Case Management Conference has been set for July 2, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by June 25th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-02025-HSG. The July 2nd proceeding will be held by AT&T Conference Line. The parties are advised that in the event of an audio problem, counsel should be prepared to attend the hearing via Zoom conference at the Courts direction. The court circulates the following conference number to allow the equivalent of a public hearing by telephone. For conference line information, see: https://apps.cand.uscourts.gov/telhrg/ All counsel, members of the public and press please use the following dial-in information below to access the conference line: Dial In: 888-808-6929 Access Code: 6064255 The Court may be in session with proceedings in progress when you connect to the conference line. Therefore, mute your phone if possible and wait for the Court to address you before speaking on the line. For call clarity, parties shall NOT use speaker phone or earpieces for these calls, and where at all possible, parties shall use landlines. The parties are further advised to ensure that the Court can hear and understand them clearly before speaking at length. PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. PLEASE NOTE: All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for a telephonic case management conference are required to dial-in at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD.
Related: [-]
14 14 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 05/02 2:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Charles R. Breyer no longer assigned to case. Signed by Clerk on 05/02/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Thu 05/02 6:09 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/2/2024. (ls, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
12 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Charles R. Breyer for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virgina K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
11 11 This case will be randomly reassigned to a District Judge outside the San Jose Division pursuant to the Caseload Rebalancing Pilot Program approved by the Court effective March 1, 2018. For information, visit our web page at[LINK:https://cand.uscourts.gov/notices/northern-district-extends-caseload-rebalancing-pilot-program/] . (smc, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
10 10 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
9 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Federal Insurance Company. Effectus Group, LLC served on 4/25/2024, answer due 5/16/2024. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Federal Insurance Company.. (Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
7 7 Summons Issued as to Effectus Group, LLC. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/25/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/2/2024 01:30 PM in San Jose, - Videoconference Only. (far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 19, 2024
5 5 ORDER Granting 4 Application for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Hunt, Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi on 4/19/2024. (amk, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Andrew G. Hunt, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19338057.) filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Hunt, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
3 3 Proposed Summons. (Whitehead, Henry)
Related: [-]
2 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 4/17/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Federal Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19286006.). Filed by Federal Insurance Company.(Whitehead, Henry)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet