District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Ana C Reyes
Case #: 1:24-cv-01301
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:10 AM EDT
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION
Represented By
Tabitha Bartholomew
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION
Represented By
Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Stamboulieh Law, PLLC
contact info
Robert Jeffrey Olson
William J. Olson, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Stephen D. Stamboulieh
Stamboulieh Law, PLLC
contact info
Robert Jeffrey Olson
William J. Olson, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
13 13 misc Status Report Wed 04/02 1:12 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
12 12 misc Status Report Mon 01/27 1:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 misc Status Report Tue 11/26 5:24 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
10 10 misc Status Report Wed 08/28 11:25 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/22 6:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In their9 Joint Status Report the parties report that, "having conferred," they require the Court to intervene in a document production dispute. The titanic struggle requiring this Court's prompt and focused attention? Plaintiffs demand that Defendant start production of documents in 30 days while Defendant asks for 90 days. Weighty as this quarrel may be, the Court is sanguine about the parties' ability to resolve it themselves. The Court therefore ORDERS the parties to meet and confer in person (not by video or phone) and submit, on or before September 5, 2024, a further Joint Status Report detailing the parties' plan for a rolling document production. The Court hears Plaintiffs' complaint that 90 days puts the start of production "just after the November presidential election." Dkt. 9 at 2. The Court is skeptical, however, that the start date of a complex and rolling document production concerning the "monitoring of firearm sales by government entities," id. , will turn the tide of?or even cause the slightest ripple in?the upcoming election. The Court suggests therefore that the parties negotiate the start date based on Defendant's capacity and ability to begin production. If the parties are unable to reach a compromise, the Court will enter a show cause order on sanctions to the party or parties it finds did not act reasonably and in good faith. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 08/22/2024. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
9 9 misc Status Report Wed 08/21 5:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
8 8 misc Status Report Fri 07/19 9:59 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
7 7 misc Status Report Thu 06/20 1:49 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION. (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
order .Order Fri 06/07 11:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff filed this Freedom of Information Act (FOIA) action on May 3, 2024. Dkt.1 . Defendant filed its Answer on June 5, 2024. Dkt.6 . Cases filed under FOIA are exempt from the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f) and Local Civil Rule 16.3. See LCvR 16.3(b)(10). Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS the parties to meet and confer and file a joint status report on or before June 20, 2024. The joint status report should address, among other things, (1) the status of Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (2) the anticipated number of documents responsive to Plaintiff's FOIA requests; (3) the anticipated date(s) for release of those documents; and (4) whether a motion for a stay under Open America v. Watergate Special Prosecution Force , 547 F.2d 605 (D.C. Cir. 1976), is likely. As set forth in Section 5(d) of the Court's Standing Order, if the parties agree on a proposed schedule for submitting a further joint status report, they should assume that the Court approves the proposed date unless the Court enters an order to the contrary. Counsel shall not contact Chambers directly concerning scheduling or other matters, as Chambers personnel will not handle questions relating to the status or scheduling of pending matters, except in case of an emergency. In an emergency, Chambers can be reached at (202) 354-3350. Signed by Judge Ana C. Reyes on 6/7/2024. (lcacr1)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 06/07 7:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 6/20/2024. (zcdw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/05 8:40 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION.(Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/04 12:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Jeffrey Olson on behalf of GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC. (Olson, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tabitha Bartholomew on behalf of FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION (Bartholomew, Tabitha)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 05/06 7:56 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice and Consent
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 05/06 7:53 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ana C. Reyes. (znmw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
2 2 notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Fri 05/03 11:22 AM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION, GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC.(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Gun Owners Foundation 26.1 statement
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 11:18 AM
COMPLAINT against FEDERAL BUREAU INVESTIGATION ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-10870631) filed by GUN OWNERS OF AMERICA, INC., GUN OWNERS FOUNDATION.(Stamboulieh, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit FBI Nics Monitoring update 9.8.23 FOIA,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1495550-001 Acknowledgement,
Att: 4 Exhibit FBI Nics Monitoring all sources FOIA,
Att: 5 Exhibit 1495550-001 Update,
Att: 6 Summons,
Att: 7 Summons,
Att: 8 Summons