Illinois Southern District Court
Judge:Nancy J Rosenstengel
Case #: 3:24-cv-01214
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Case in other court:Fourth Judicial Circuit Effingham County, 2024LA16
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Holden Family, LLC
Represented By
James J. Zych
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info
Robert E. Eggmann, III
Carmody Macdonald PC
contact info
Defendant
Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC
Represented By
James J. Zych
Carmody Macdonald P.C.
contact info
Robert E. Eggmann, III
Carmody Macdonald PC
contact info
Defendant
Palladium Grid LLC
Plaintiff
Midland States Bank
Represented By
Christopher R. LaRose
Armstrong Teasdale Llp - St. Louis
contact info
Bruce LeMoine
Armstrong Teasdale Llp - St. Louis
contact info

GPO Jun 06 2024
ORDER regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Action due by 6/14/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/6/2024. (dkb).
GPO Mar 28 2025
ORDER: The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Midland States Bank (Doc. 22) is DENIED without prejudice. Midland may refile its motion at the close of discovery. The Court will set a Rule 16 Scheduling and Discovery Conference by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/28/2025. (mlp)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
36 36 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/31 2:48 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Scheduling Conference is SET for 5/1/2025 at 11:00 AM before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Connection information to the video conference will be emailed to counsel. The parties are to submit a Joint Report and Proposed Scheduling and Discovery Order seven (7) days before the conference via e-mail to NJRpd@ilsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/31/2025. (drb)
Related: [-]
35 35 notice CJRA Track Mon 03/31 2:38 PM
CJRA TRACK C assigned: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2026 at 1:30 PM in East St. Louis Courthouse before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Presumptive Bench Trial Month set for July 2026.(drb)
Related: [-]
34 34 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Mon 03/31 2:35 PM
MANDATORY MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/31/2025. (drb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
33 33 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Fri 03/28 3:14 PM
ORDER: The Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Midland States Bank (Doc.22 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Midland may refile its motion at the close of discovery. The Court will set a Rule 16 Scheduling and Discovery Conference by separate order. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 3/28/2025. (mlp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
32 32 3 pgs motion Default Judgment Wed 12/11 9:36 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Midland States Bank.(LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, October 07, 2024
31 31 order Clerks Entry of Default Mon 10/07 9:14 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Palladium Grid LLC30 . Signed on 10/7/2024.(clw)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
30 30 motion Default Fri 10/04 2:33 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by Midland States Bank.(LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, September 23, 2024
29 29 13 pgs respm Reply Mon 09/23 2:40 PM
REPLY to22 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Midland States Bank. (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 09/05 11:11 AM
ORDER GRANTING27 Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in support of22 its Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's reply shall be filed on or before September 23, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 9/5/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 09/05 12:33 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines as to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Support Thereof . Replies due by 9/23/2024. (clw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 09/04 11:40 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Support Thereof by Midland States Bank. (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 08/27 12:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Midland States Bank. Palladium Grid LLC served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
25 25 17 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/26 5:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Support Thereof filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC.(Zych, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 9 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Natalie Riley,
Att: 2 14 pgs Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Natalie Riley,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Natalie Riley
Thursday, August 01, 2024
24 24 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 08/01 8:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING23 Defendants' Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC have requested an extension of time to respond to Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc.22 ). This request is GRANTED. Defendants SHALL file a response on or before August 26, 2024. (Action due by 8/26/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 8/1/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/31 5:10 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to22 MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Support Thereof by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. (Zych, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
22 22 11 pgs motion Summary Judgment Fri 07/12 3:54 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment Plaintiff Midland States Bank's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Memorandum of Support Thereof by Midland States Bank.(LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Loan Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Holden Guaranty,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Legacy Guaranty,
Att: 5 6 pgs Exhibit E - 4/1/24 Letter,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Dickmann Declaration,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Declaration of Christopher R. LaRose
Monday, June 17, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Modification Mon 06/17 8:22 AM
NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re19 Amended Document filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Modified to State the Document is an Amended Notice of Removal.20 Amended Document filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Modified to State the Document is an Amended Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement. No further action is required by the filer in relation to this notification. (clw)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 14, 2024
20 20 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 06/14 3:35 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Amendment to5 Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement . (Zych, James)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Fri 06/14 3:32 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal, .(Zych, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Thursday, June 06, 2024
18 18 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 06/06 9:24 AM
ORDER regarding Subject Matter Jurisdiction. (Action due by 6/14/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 6/6/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
17 17 9 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 11:20 AM
ANSWER to Complaint //Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Holden Family, LLC by Holden Family, LLC.(Zych, James)
Related: [-]
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 05/31 11:19 AM
ANSWER to Complaint //Answer and Affirmative Defenses of Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC by Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC.(Zych, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
15 15 order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 05/28 11:56 AM
ORDER GRANTING14 Defendants Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC's, Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendants SHALL file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before Friday, May 31, 2024. (Holden Family, LLC answer due 5/31/2024; Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC answer due 5/31/2024). Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/28/2024. (dkb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/24 3:40 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. (Zych, James)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/24 12:04 PM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/24 12:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Zych on behalf of Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC (Zych, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Fri 05/24 11:02 AM
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT/REASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, this case will remain with the assigned Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. This Notice does not alter any prior referrals of motions or matters pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636(b)(1-3). (clw)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Consent/Non-Consent to US Magistrate Judge Fri 05/24 10:11 AM
CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Tue 05/14 2:47 PM
Summons Issued as to Palladium Grid LLC. Original sent to counsel for service. (clw)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Requested Tue 05/14 1:35 PM
Summons Requested. (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 05/13 9:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce LeMoine on behalf of Midland States Bank (LeMoine, Bruce)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/10 12:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. LaRose on behalf of Midland States Bank (LaRose, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 05/06 1:17 PM
Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Action Mon 05/06 9:23 AM
NOTICE OF ACTION re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Holden Family, LLC, Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC. Because the required Disclosure Statement was not filed with the attached, this matter is being submitted to the presiding judge for further action. A copy of this Court's form Disclosure Statement can be found at[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx] . (clw)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
3 3 notice Notice Requesting Consent Fri 05/03 12:53 PM
NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Midland States Bank, Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order Nos. 347 and 367, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience:[LINK:https://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/sites/ilsd/files/BenefitsofConsent.pdf] . Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Midland States Bank, Holden Family, LLC and Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC on 5/3/2024. Consent due by 5/24/2024 (clw)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Opening Notification Fri 05/03 12:52 PM
Notice of Judge Assignment. Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel assigned. All future documents must bear case number 24-CV-1214-NJR. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. (clw)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 05/03 11:29 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Fourth Judicial Circuit, Effingham County, case number 2024LA16 ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AILSDC-5380248), filed by Legacy Mesa QOF, LLC, Holden Family, LLC.(Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 95 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit B