Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-00693

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-00087
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
LORD PINDERNATION
18420 West Solano Drive
Litchfield Park, AZ 85027
Represented By
LORD PINDERNATION
contact info
Plaintiff
Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC
2550 W. Union Hills Dr Ste 350
Phoenix, AZ 85027
Represented By
RONALD DAVID ROACH
Rdr Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MST
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 order oGranting Thu 03/20 10:31 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 3/20/2025 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation
Thursday, March 13, 2025
17 17 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Thu 03/13 1:06 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDERNATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
16 16 other Stipulation Thu 03/13 1:03 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Third) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC, LORD PINDERNATION. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 02/26 10:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
14 14 order oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form Mon 02/24 2:48 PM
ORDER Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary . (RIV)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 order oApproving Wed 08/21 10:15 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 8/21/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 07/17 5:09 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDERNATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
11 11 court Deficiency Memo (QC Form) Tue 07/16 2:38 PM
Deficiency Memo Related [+] (SKG)
Related: [-] 10 Notice of Lodging Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
10 10 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 07/15 6:08 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDERNATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
9 9 other Stipulation Mon 07/15 6:07 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Second) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC, LORD PINDERNATION. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
8 8 order oGranting Fri 06/21 12:00 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 6/21/2024 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Monday, June 17, 2024
7 7 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 06/17 5:05 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDERNATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
6 6 other Stipulation Mon 06/17 5:04 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC, LORD PINDERNATION. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 05/14 8:10 AM
Amended Complaint against Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC filed by RONALD DAVID ROACH of Rdr Law, Plc on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC Related [+]. (ROACH, RONALD)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Exhibit Demand letter
Friday, May 03, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued (Form) Fri 05/03 9:04 AM
Summons Issued . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
3 3 other Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 05/02 1:38 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC filed by RONALD DAVID ROACH of Rdr Law, Plc on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC. (ROACH, RONALD)
Related: [-]
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 05/02 1:36 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by RONALD DAVID ROACH of Rdr Law, Plc on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC. (ROACH, RONALD)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 05/02 1:34 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00087. Complaint (350.00 fee) against LORD PINDERNATION filed by RONALD DAVID ROACH of Rdr Law, Plc on behalf of Multiservicios Claro Que Si LLC Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury). (ROACH, RONALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Demand Letter