Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-21148

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-02081
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Porter Billing Services LLC
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Matheson Postal Services, Inc.
9785 Goethe Road
Sacramento, CA 95827
Represented By
Kara E Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
26 26 misc Matter Continued * Mon 04/07 3:24 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02081 by Matheson Postal Services, Inc. against Porter Billing Services LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348186) (smis) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 5/7/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
25 25 audio Audio Docket Entry Wed 04/02 3:48 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [04/02/2025 01:58:00 PM]. File Size [ 895 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:24 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
24 24 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 03/27 8:44 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of23 Answer to Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 03/27 8:43 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Porter Billing Services LLC. (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
utility Add Party via Internet Site Fri 03/07 10:34 AM
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
22 22 order Application and Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 03/07 8:33 AM
Motion/Application and Order Granting Admission to Practice pro hac vice by Jonathan Elliot Raulston. Filed by Defendant Porter Billing Services LLC (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 02/27 9:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
19 19 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 02/25 9:36 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (smis)
Related: [-]
18 18 order Vacating Order Tue 02/25 9:32 AM
Order Vacating12 Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Update Deadline; Follow Up 3/27/2025. (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
18 18 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Tue 02/25 9:31 AM
Order Approving16 Stipulation ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (smis)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 misc Matter Continued * Thu 02/27 10:47 AM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02081 by Matheson Postal Services, Inc. against Porter Billing Services LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348186) (smis) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 4/2/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
17 17 audio Audio Docket Entry Fri 02/21 3:54 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [02/21/2025 02:11:00 PM]. File Size [ 977 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:39 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
16 16 misc Stipulation Tue 02/18 4:14 PM
Stipulation Stipulation to Vacate Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Filed by Defendant Porter Billing Services LLC (smis)
Related: [-]
virtual Entry - CM - Proposed Order Not Required or Prematurely or Incorrectly Submitted Tue 02/18 3:19 PM
An order has been incorrectly submitted. Replacement Order requested Re: Order Approving Stipulation to Vacate Entry of Default. Replacement Order should be submitted by selecting Proposed Orders from the Filing Menu in the CAEB e-Filing System. (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
utility Add Party via Internet Site Mon 02/17 4:43 PM
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
15 15 reports Status Report Tue 02/11 3:22 PM
Status Report [ASK-1] Re:1 Complaint (msts)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
14 14 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Thu 01/30 9:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 notice BNC Service of Document Tue 01/28 4:44 PM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (smis)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Entry of Default & Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures Tue 01/28 4:44 PM
Entry of Default and Order Re: Default Judgment Procedures. Entry of Default of Defendant Porter Billing Services LLC Request for entry of default judgment due by 2/27/2025. (smis)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 01/27 3:29 PM
Request for Entry of Default of Porter Billing Services LLC Filed by Plaintiff Matheson Postal Services, Inc. (svim)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
10 10 misc Matter Continued * Mon 01/27 1:13 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02081 by Matheson Postal Services, Inc. against Porter Billing Services LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348186) (smis) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 2/21/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 misc Matter Continued * Thu 09/12 4:46 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02081 by Matheson Postal Services, Inc. against Porter Billing Services LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348186) (smis) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 1/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 06/13 3:34 PM
Order to Reschedule Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 9/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis) Modified on 6/14/2024 (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/09 1:41 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 05/03 10:10 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 05/03 10:10 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 05/03 10:10 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 7/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 05/03 10:11 AM
Exhibit(s) Re:1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 05/03 10:09 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (smis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 05/03 10:09 AM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02081 by Matheson Postal Services, Inc. against Porter Billing Services LLC. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348186) (smis)
Related: [-]