Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-21148

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-02100
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Terminated:Aug 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Committed Elite Response Team
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc.
9785 Goethe Road
Sacramento, CA 95827
Represented By
Kara E Casteel
Ask LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Friday, August 09, 2024
utility Close Adversary Proceeding Fri 08/09 9:51 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:24-ap-2100 Closed (smis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
11 11 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Wed 07/24 9:16 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
10 10 notice BNC Service of Document Mon 07/22 8:20 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (smis)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Mon 07/22 8:19 AM
Notice of Dismissal (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2024
8 8 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Thu 06/13 2:03 PM
Order to Reschedule Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 9/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis) Modified on 6/13/2024 (smis). Modified on 6/14/2024 (smis)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Thu 05/09 1:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (msts)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
6 6 related Exhibit(s) Fri 05/03 12:58 PM
Exhibit(s) Re:1 Complaint (smis)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Fri 05/03 12:57 PM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Fri 05/03 12:57 PM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Fri 05/03 12:56 PM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 7/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Fri 05/03 12:56 PM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (smis)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Fri 05/03 12:55 PM
(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) : Complaint 24-02100 by Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc. against Committed Elite Response Team. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348495) (smis)
Related: [-]