Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Clifton L Corker
Referred: Cynthia R Wyrick
Case #: 2:24-cv-00073
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 7:36 AM EDT
Defendant
Todd O. Brock
Represented By
Joseph Bernard Harvey
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Defendant
Partner Industrial LP
Represented By
Joseph Bernard Harvey
Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport
contact info
Plaintiff
Destiny Baker
Represented By
Charlton R DeVault, Jr
Law Office Of Charlton R Devault , Jr
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
15 15 order Scheduling Order Tue 11/19 12:09 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury Trial set for 9/8/2026 09:00 AM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/25/2026 01:30 PM in Courtroom 420 - Greeneville before District Judge Clifton L Corker. Motions due by 1/23/2026 .Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on November 19, 2024. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/13 8:42 AM
ORDER.Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2024 11:00 AM before District Judge Clifton L Corker.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on November 13, 2024. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
13 13 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/12 4:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Harvey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/07 11:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/18/2024 per12 Order. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order Fri 10/04 1:27 PM
ORDER. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 10/4/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Tue 09/17 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT To Magistrate Judge by Todd O. Brock, Partner Industrial LP (Harvey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Wed 09/11 1:38 PM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided.Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 9/11/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent/NonConsent Form
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/10 3:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Todd O. Brock, Partner Industrial LP.(Harvey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Corporate Interest Tue 08/20 3:20 PM
Certificate of Corporate Interest by Todd O. Brock, Partner Industrial LP. (Harvey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 08/20 3:06 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Harvey, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Citizenship Wed 05/08 10:09 PM
Certificate of Citizenship by Destiny Baker. (DeVault, Charlton)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
5 5 5 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Mon 05/06 11:07 AM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/6/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Mon 05/06 11:06 AM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/6/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Mon 05/06 11:06 AM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Clifton L Corker on 5/6/2024. (DCB)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/06 11:03 AM
Summons Issued as to Todd O. Brock and Partner Industrial LP.(DCB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons - Partner Industrial
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/06 10:54 AM
District Judge Clifton L Corker and Magistrate Judge Cynthia R Wyrick added. (DCB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Failure to File Certificate of Citizenship Mon 05/06 11:10 AM
NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Certificate of Citizenship in a diversity case as required by FRCP 7.1 by Destiny Baker. (DCB)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 2:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5666519.), filed by Destiny Baker.(DeVault, Charlton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Partner Industrial LP,
Att: 2 Summons to Todd O. Brock,
Att: 3 Other Civil Cover Sheet