Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12361
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-12361
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael E Romero |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-12362 |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $100,001 to $500,000 |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.
27740 E Lakeview Dr
Aurora, CO 80016-2865 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294 |
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
43 | 43
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 06/12 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
42 | 42
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 06/12 10:17 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 06/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
41 | 41
order
Approving Retainer
Mon 06/10 3:45 PM
Order Approving Retainer . (jss) |
|
40 | 40
order
Employ
Mon 06/10 3:41 PM
Order Approving Application To Employ Attorneys . (jss) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
39 | 39
misc
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter
Fri 06/07 2:46 PM
Certificate of Non-Contested Matter Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. . (Riley, Keri) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2024 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/22 4:28 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ryan Blansett on behalf of Primary Point Services, LLC... (Blansett, Ryan) |
|
37 | 37
notice
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 05/22 4:25 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by John F. Young on behalf of Primary Point Services, LLC... (Young, John) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Certificate of Service
Mon 05/20 1:17 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. . (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Other Creditor Matrix | ||
Sunday, May 19, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/19 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
34 | 34
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/19 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
33 | 33
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/19 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/19/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
order
Use Cash Collateral
Fri 05/17 3:21 PM
Order Granting Motion To Use Cash Collateral . (jss) |
|
31 | 31
order
Other Order
Fri 05/17 2:29 PM
Order Authorizing (A) Payment Of Prepetition Employee Wages And Salaries; And (B) Payment Of All Costs And Expenses Incident To The Foregoing Payments . (jss) |
|
30 | 30
order
Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Fri 05/17 2:26 PM
Minutes of Proceeding. The Court will hold a final, in-person hearing on the Motions to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. and Debtor Covalent Facility Management, Inc., and any objections thereto on July 1, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. in the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado, Courtroom C, U.S. Custom House, 721 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Court will grant the Motions to Use Cash Collateral and Motions to Pay Prepetition Wages filed by Debtor Apex Accounting and Tax and Debtor Covalent Facility Management. Separate orders will enter. . (jss) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 05/16 3:14 PM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by David Olsky on behalf of Miller Money Management, Inc.... (Olsky, David) |
|
Sunday, May 12, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/12 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
27 | 27
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors
Sun 05/12 10:14 PM
Courts Notice and BNC Certificate of Mailing Re: Meeting of Creditors . No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 05/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Saturday, May 11, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 05/11 10:14 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/11/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 05/10 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 05/10/2024. (Admin.) |
|
24 | 24
court
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Fri 05/10 3:38 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case & Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/6/2024 at 09:30 AM at Telephonic Chapter 11: Phone 888-497-4718, Passcode 6026644#. Last day to oppose dischargeability is 8/5/2024. Proofs of Claim due by 7/12/2024. (rjr) |
|
23 | 23
order
Minutes of Proceedings/Minute Order
Fri 05/10 3:33 PM
Minute Order. The Court continued the Video Hearing to Friday, May 17, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. Debtor shall provide notice of the continuedhearing to creditors and parties in interest. The Zoom link and all other relevant information is available on the Courtswebsite at https://www.cob.uscourts.gov/content/judge-michael-e-romero-mer. Debtor Apex Accounting and Tax and Debtor Covalent Facility Management shall provide notice to creditors via overnightmail or comparable service of their Motions to Pay Contract Labor/Critical Vendors. Objections shall be due by May 16,2024. The Court will grant the Motions to Use Cash Collateral and Motions to Pay Prepetition Wages filed by Debtor ApexAccounting and Tax and Debtor Covalent Facility Management for the limited purpose of paying wages/salaries toemployees only. Debtors will submit revised proposed orders. Debtor Apex Accounting and Tax and Debtor Covalent Facility Management shall file and serve revised cash collateralbudgets. . Hearing to be held on 5/17/2024 at 01:30 PM Courtroom C for1 and for17 and for15 , . (jss) |
|
22 | 22
answer
Objection
Fri 05/10 12:23 PM
Objection Filed by Alan K. Motes on behalf of US Trustee . (Motes, Alan) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Certificate of Service
Thu 05/09 2:52 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. . (Riley, Keri) |
|
20 | 20
order
Expedite Hearing
Thu 05/09 2:27 PM
Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing . Hearing to be held on 5/10/2024 at 02:00 PM Courtroom C for19 , . (jss) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Expedite Hearing
Thu 05/09 12:00 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. . (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
18 | 18
misc
Document/Support Document
Thu 05/09 11:59 AM
Declaration of Hong Thi Spelgatti Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Motion
Thu 05/09 11:58 AM
Motion for an Order Authorizing (A) Payment of Pre-Petition Employee Wages and Salaries and (B) Payment of all Costs and Expenses Incident to the Foregoing Payments Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
16 | 16
notice
9013-1.1 Notice
Thu 05/09 11:56 AM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. .. 9013 Objections due by 5/23/2024 for15 ,. (Riley, Keri) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Use Cash Collateral
Thu 05/09 11:54 AM
Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Att: 2 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wed 05/08 10:15 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/08/2024. (Admin.) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice Appointing Subchapter V Trustee
Wed 05/08 4:57 PM
Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee. Trustee Mark David Dennis added to the case. Filed by Alan K. Motes on behalf of US Trustee... (Motes, Alan) |
|
12 | 12
order
Joint Administration
Wed 05/08 3:34 PM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration . (jss) |
|
Tuesday, May 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
9013-1.1 Notice
Tue 05/07 5:43 PM
9013-1.1 Notice Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc. .. 9013 Objections due by 5/21/2024 for10 ,. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Other Creditor Matrix | ||
10 | 10
motion
Approve Retainer
Tue 05/07 5:42 PM
Motion to Approve Retainer In The Amount Of $7,466.97 Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
9 | 9
motion
Joint Administration
Tue 05/07 2:34 PM
Motion for Joint Administration Of The Following Cases: Case No. 24-12361 MER; Case No. 24-12362 MER; and Case No. 24-12364 MER Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
6
pgs
motion
Employ
Mon 05/06 5:10 PM
Application to Employ Kutner Brinen Dickey Riley PC as Attorneys Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order | ||
7 | 7
court
Notice of Deficiency
Mon 05/06 10:11 AM
Notice of Deficiency For Omission of Information: Corporate Resolution, Disclosure Regarding Receivers, Balance Sheet, Statement of Operations, Cash-Flow Statement, Chapter 11 Federal Income Tax Return, Missing document(s) due by 5/13/2024. . (jss) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice
Mon 05/06 9:18 AM
Entry of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Alan K. Motes on behalf of US Trustee... (Motes, Alan) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Fri 05/03 3:56 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition - Chapter 11([LINK 24-12362 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A32753367. Fee amount 1738.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
misc
List of Equity Security Holders
Fri 05/03 3:55 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
3 | 3
misc
20 Largest Unsecured Creditors
Fri 05/03 3:52 PM
Non-Individual List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement (Rule 7007.1)
Fri 05/03 3:52 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7007.1. Filed by Keri L. Riley on behalf of Apex Accounting and Tax, Inc.. (Riley, Keri) |
|
1 | 1
31
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Fri 05/03 3:51 PM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Total Number of Creditors Uploaded: 24. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan due by 08/1/2024. Government Proofs of Claim due by 10/30/2024. (Riley, Keri) |