USA v. Luna
Arizona District Court | |
Case #: | 2:24-cr-00761 |
Case Filed: | May 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 12:18 AM MST |
Defendant
Dennis Luna (1)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2024 1:07 AM MST |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
Arrest of Dennis Luna on 4/17/2024. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01641-JFM] | ||
Thursday, April 18, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
3 | 3 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance for Material Witness in case as to Dennis Luna held on 4/19/2024. Material Witness is present and in custody. Karina Ordonez appointed as counsel for the material witness with appointment type CJA. Material witness states true name to be Moises Isaias Gavino-Gonzalez. Material Witness is ordered to remain detained pursuant to the Affidavit and ordered transferred to the District Court in Phoenix for all further proceedings. Counsel waives material witness' presence at future proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Nwoga (Duty) for the Government, CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez for material witness who is present and in custody assisted by the Spanish Interpreter Miguel Aguayo. Status Hearing regarding Material Witness Video Deposition Hearing set for 4/24/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 304, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey. Hearing held 11:42 AM to 11:48 AM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01641-JFM] | |
4 | 4 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf: Initial Appearance as to Dennis Luna held on 4/19/2024. Appointing Maritza Heras for Dennis Luna with Appointment Type: AFPD. Defendant(s) state true name to be the same. Government requests detention. Detention Hearing held. Defendant ordered/continued detained pending trial. Preliminary Hearing waived. Finding: Defendant held to answer before District Court. Defendant is advised of the Status Hearing regarding Material Witness Video Deposition Hearing set for 4/24/24 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Morrissey and ordered transferred to the District Court in Phoenix or all further proceedings. As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all information required by Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Appearances : AUSA Joseph Nwoga (Duty) for the Government, AFPD Maitza Heras for defendant. Defendant is present and in custody. Hearing held 12:13 PM to 12:26 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (JMA) [2:24-mj-01641-JFM] | |
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() |
|
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |
|
9 | 9 ORDER: Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is ordered to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant(s), that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant(s) or tends to cast doubt on the United States' case, as required by Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge James F Metcalf.(JMA)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) [2:24-mj-01641-JFM] | |
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2024 | ||
12 | 12 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael T Morrissey: Status Hearing re: Material Witness Video Depositions as to Dennis Luna held on 4/24/2024. Defendant and Material Witness' presence previously waived by counsel. The parties previously filed a Stipulation for the Release of Material Witness (Doc.11 ). SO ORDERED. Material Witness counsel Karina Ordonez is excused. Order to issue. Appearances : AUSA Matthew Doyle for the Government, AFPD Susan Anderson on behalf of Maritza Heras for Defendant, and CJA Attorney Karina Ordonez for Material Witness. Defendant is not present and in custody. Hearing held 1:34 PM to 1:35 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KGM) [2:24-mj-01641-JFM] | |
13 | 13
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() |
|
15 | 15
![]() |
|
16 | 16
![]() |
|
17 | 17
![]() |
|
19 | 19 The parties having contacted the court, IT IS ORDERED, as to Dennis Luna, Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/13/2024 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John Z Boyle.(rkt)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) |