Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00069
Case Filed:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Apr 02, 2025
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 3:17 AM EDT
Defendant
Nicholas Price (1)
Represented By
Stacey Lee MacDonald
Federal Public Defenders Southern Ohio
contact info
Brandon Elliot Shroy
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Peter K. Glenn-Applegate
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info

GPO Sep 30 2024
ORDER denying 37 Motion to Revoke Detention Order as to Nicholas Price (1). Signed by Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/30/2024. (cmw)

Docket last updated: 04/03/2025 6:31 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
1 1 11 pgs COMPLAINT as to Nicholas Price (1). (jr) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
Arrest of Nicholas Price (sh) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King:Initial Appearance as to Nicholas Price held on 3/6/2024; Dft appeared with retained counsel Brandon Shroy, advised of his rights charges and penalties; Gov seeks detention; DH set for 3/8/24 at 2:00 PM. (sh) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
4 4 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Nicholas Price Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/6/24. (sh) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Nicholas Price Detention Hearing set for 3/8/2024 @ 2:00 PM in Courtroom 220 before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/6/24. (sh) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs **CORRECTED** ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Nicholas Price Detention Hearing set for 3/8/2024 @ 1:30 PM in Courtroom 220 before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/6/24. (sh) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
7 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King: Detention Hearing as to Nicholas Price held on 3/8/2024. Dft's release temporarily STAYED. (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Nicholas Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Norah McCann King on 3/8/2024. Related [+] (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-] lease temporarily STAYED.
Thursday, March 14, 2024
15 15 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 3/6/24 in case as to Nicholas Price. (jr) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Nicholas Price. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/21/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Nicholas Price. (mas) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brandon Shroy. by Nicholas Price. (Shroy, Brandon) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HEARING as to Nicholas Price. Preliminary Hearing reset for 3/27/2024 01:30 PM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (Previously set for 3/21/2024.) (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
11 11 Notation ORDER Granting10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Brandon Elliot Shroy withdrawn from case as to Nicholas Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/21/2024. (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
12 12 Notation ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER for Nicholas Price. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/21/2024. (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
NOTICE OF CHANGE IN HEARING as to Nicholas Price. Preliminary Hearing reset for 5/3/2024 02:00 PM in Courtroom 203 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (Previously set for 3/27/2024.) (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
13 13 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Indict New date requested 5/3/2024. , Joint MOTION to Continue Preliminary Hearing by USA as to Nicholas Price. (Glenn-Applegate, Peter) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
14 14 Notation ORDER Granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Indict as to Nicholas Price and Motion to Continue the 5/27/2024 Preliminary Hearing. For the reasons set forth in the parties' joint motion, the Court finds that there is good cause to grant an extension of time in which to return an indictment or file an information, that the extension would best serve the interests of justice, and that the time is excludable pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). Accordingly, the Court GRANTS an extension until 5/3/2024 to return an Indictment or Information pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(b). Preliminary Hearing continued to 5/3/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 3/25/2024. (sln) [2:24-mj-00105-KAJ]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
17 17 11 pgs INDICTMENT as to Nicholas Price (1) counts 1-35 and Forfeiture Allegation. (cmw)
Related: [-]