District Of Columbia District Court
Case #: 1:24-cr-00170
Case Filed:Apr 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 3:25 AM EDT
Defendant
JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (1)
Represented By
Jay P. Mykytiuk
Scrofano Law PC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shehzad Akhtar
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2024 4:17 AM EDT
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
Arrest of JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Temporary Detention by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: In Person Return on Arrest Warrant/ Initial Appearance as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (1) held on 2/7/2024. Defendant was present in the Courtroom. Defendant retained Attorney, Jay Mykytuik as counsel. The Court advised the Government of its due process obligations under Rule 5(f). Oral Motion by the Government for Temporary Detention as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1); heard and granted. Detention Hearing set for 2/9/2024 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Committed/ Commitment Issued; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [3:53:18-4:04:42]; Defense Attorney: Jay Mykytiuk; U.S. Attorney: Shehzad Akhtar; Pretrial Officer: Jaynice Harden. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (1). (zljn) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Statement of Facts
6 6 Arrest Warrant, dated 2/7/2024, Returned Executed on 2/7/2024 as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
7 7 MINUTE ORDER as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (1): As required by Rule 5(f), the United States is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 2/7/2024. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
4 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jay P. Mykytiuk appearing for JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (Mykytiuk, Jay) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
5 5 10 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Pretrial Detention by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (Akhtar, Shehzad) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
ORAL MOTION for Release from Custody by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: In Person Detention Hearing as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III held on 2/9/2024. Defendant was present in the courtroom. Oral Motion by the Government for Release from Custody as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1); heard and granted. Defense Counsel joined in request. Defendant placed on Personal Recognizance Bond- HISP. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial Waiver as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1); heard and granted. Time between 2/9/2024 and 3/21/2024 shall be excluded from calculation of time in the interest of justice (XT) under the Speedy Trial Act. Preliminary Hearing set for 3/21/2024 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Bond Status of Defendant: Released/ Defendant placed on Personal Recognizance Bond- HISP; Court Reporter: FTR Gold; FTR Time Frame: CTRM 6 [2:59:50-3:24:47], [3:45:58-3:55:36]; Defense Attorney: Jay Mykytiuk; U.S. Attorney: Shehzad Akhtar; Pretrial Officer: Britney Dahlkoetter; 3rd Party Custodians: Lauren Worrell and Janet Worrell. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1) Personal Recognizance Bond- HISP. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 2/9/2024. (bb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
9 9 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (Akhtar, Shehzad) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
10 10 ORDER granting9 Motion for Protective Order Governing Discovery as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 2/27/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 13, 2024
MINUTE ORDER as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III re11 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. The Court will address Defendant's motion to modify conditions of release at the hearing currently scheduled for March 21, 2024, at 3:00 p.m. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/13/24. (MFB) Modified on 3/14/2024 (znjb). [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
11 11 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III.(Mykytiuk, Jay) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, March 21, 2024
ORAL MOTION for Speedy Trial by USA as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Status Hearing in re: Modify to Conditions of Release as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III held on 3/21/2024. Motion to Modify Conditions of Release11 as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1); heard and granted. Oral Motion by the Government for Speedy Trial as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1); heard and granted. Speedy Trial Excluded from 3/21/2024 to 4/9/2024 in the Interest of Justice (XT). Status Conference set for 4/9/2024 at 2:30 PM by Telephonic/VTC before Magistrate Judge Zia M. Faruqui. Bond Status of Defendant: Defendant Remain on Personal Recognizance; Court Reporter: FTR-GOLD; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 6: [3:55:15-4:11:55]; Defense Attorney: Jay Mykytiuk; US Attorney: Shezhad Akhtar; Pretrial Officer: John Copes. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER MODIFYING PRETRIAL RELEASE CONDITIONS as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/21/2024. (ztl) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
15 15 Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III.(Mykytiuk, Jay) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, March 29, 2024
16 16 SECOND ORDER granting15 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL III (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 3/29/2024. (znjb) [1:24-mj-00050-GMH]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 05, 2024
18 18 INFORMATION as to JOHN CONRAD WORRELL, III (1) count(s) 1, 2. (FORFEITURE ALLEGATION) (zhsj)
Related: [-]