Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Tony N Leung
Case #: 0:24-cv-01626
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:May 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 11, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 3:59 AM CDT
Defendant
C.H. Robinson International, Inc.
Represented By
James T. Smith
Huffman, Usem, Crawford & Greenberg, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Chubb European Group Ltd.
825 Berry Street 205
st paul, MN 55114
Represented By
Delin Qu
Delin Qu, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
12 12 order Order Dismissing Case Fri 10/11 3:36 PM
(Text-Only) ORDER DISMISSING CASE The Court having been advised that the above action has settled, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, the Court retaining jurisdiction for sixty days to permit any party to move or reopen the action, for good cause shown, or to submit and file a stipulated form of final judgment, or to seek enforcement of the settlement terms. Ordered by Judge John R. Tunheim on 10/11/2024.(HMA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing Mon 09/30 1:04 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancellation of Hearing: Pursuant to the9 Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung is hereby CANCELLED. (JAM)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 09/30 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by C.H. Robinson International, Inc. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 08/09 4:24 PM
NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2024 at 02:30 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/9/2024. (HAM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/08 4:57 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc.. (Smith, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A
Friday, August 02, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/02 6:13 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Chubb European Group Ltd.. C.H. Robinson International, Inc. waiver sent on 6/12/2024, answer due 8/12/2024. (Qu, Delin)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 05/06 10:02 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-1626 (JRT/TNL). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 05/06 9:38 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint filed by C.H. Robinson International, Inc. filed by Chubb European Group Ltd.. (Qu, Delin)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 05, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Sun 05/05 1:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint filed by Chubb European Group Ltd. filed by Chubb European Group Ltd.. (Qu, Delin)
Related: [-]
2 2 discov Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement Sun 05/05 1:39 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Chubb European Group Ltd.. (Qu, Delin)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sun 05/05 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against C.H. Robinson International, Inc. d/b/a CHRistal Lines (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11028020) filed by Chubb European Group Ltd.. No summons requested. (Qu, Delin)
Related: [-]