Manning v. Kilduff
Illinois Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Staci M Yandle |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01223 |
Nature of Suit | 555 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Prison Condition |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | May 06, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Corrections
Scanning Shawnee
|
|
Defendant
Ryan A. Kilduff
|
|
Plaintiff
Antwon Manning
|
Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 18, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MANDATE of USCA Affirming Decision as to12 Notice of Appeal filed by Antwon Manning.(jle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Monday, November 18, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
USCA Appeal Fees
Mon 11/18 8:23 AM
USCA Appeal Fees received $ 31.99 receipt number 12398 re12 Notice of Appeal filed by Antwon Manning (clw) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION SHEET by Pro Se Party - Antwon Manning. (tkm) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis
Tue 10/01 11:59 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") on appeal (Doc. 13). The Court finds that Plaintiff is indigent and is unable to certify that this appeal is not taken in good faith. Accordingly, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $31.99. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $605.00 filing and docketing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $605.00 filing fee is paid. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff and to the Trust Fund Officer at the Shawnee Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 10/1/2024. (mamo) |
|
Wednesday, September 25, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() USCA Case Number 24-2686 for12 Notice of Appeal filed by Antwon Manning..(jle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Circuit Rule 10 Letter. (tkm) |
|
14 | 14
![]() Transmission of Short Record to US Court of Appeals re12 Notice of Appeal (tkm) |
|
13 | 13
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Antwon Manning. (jaj) |
|
12 | 12
![]() NOTICE OF APPEAL as to11 Clerk's Judgment,10 Order Dismissing Case, by Antwon Manning. (jaj) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT. Approved by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/5/2024. (jaj) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ORDER DISMISSING CASE. The1 Complaint, including COUNT 1 against RYAN KILDUFF, is DISMISSED with prejudice for failure to state a claim for relief. Because leave to amend would be futile, the entire action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 9/5/2024. (jsy) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion to Compel
Wed 08/28 10:01 AM
ORDER DENYING8 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff's1 Complaint is currently awaiting preliminary review by the Court pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915A. No additional evidence, arguments, motions, or documents are needed at this time. A copy of the Court's order will be forwarded to Plaintiff as soon as this review is completed. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 8/28/2024. (jsy) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() MOTION to Compel by Antwon Manning. (kare) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Initial Prisoner Filing Fee Received
Mon 05/20 1:08 PM
Initial Prisoner Filing Fee: $ 27.80 received, receipt number 9440 (clw) |
|
Wednesday, May 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) |
|
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Directing Prisoner Payment ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 05/13 9:40 AM
ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis ("IFP") (Doc.2 ). Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $27.80. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of Court upon receipt of this Order. Plaintiff shall make monthly payments of 20% of the preceding month's income credited to Plaintiff's prison trust fund account (including all deposits to the inmate account from any source) until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The agency having custody of Plaintiff shall forward payments from Plaintiff's account to the Clerk of this Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 until the $350.00 filing fee is paid.In addition, Plaintiff shall note that the filing fees for multiple cases cumulate. See Newlin v. Helman, 123 F.3d 429, 436 (7th Cir. 1997), overruled in part on other grounds by Lee v. Clinton, 209 F.3d 1025 (7th Cir. 2000); Walker v. O'Brien, 216 F.3d 626 (7th Cir. 2000). A prisoner who files one suit must remit 20% of his monthly income to the Clerk of the Court until his fees have been paid; a prisoner who files a second suit or an appeal must remit 40%; and so on. Newlin, 123 F.3d at 436. "Five suits or appeals mean that the prisoner's entire monthly income must be turned over to the court until the fees have been paid." Id. Payments shall be mailed to: Clerk of the Court, United States District Court for the Southern District of Illinois, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, Illinois 62201. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Trust Fund Officer at the Shawnee Correctional Center upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/13/2024. (tjk) |
|
Monday, May 06, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 5/6/2024. Consent due by 5/28/2024 (kare) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Mon 05/06 1:38 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your complaint and your motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. Your case number is 24-1223 SMY. The following is some information you should know regarding the initial stages of your lawsuit. After your filing fee status is determined, the Court will review your complaint to identify legally sufficient claims and defendants and dismiss any legally insufficient claims.: 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1915A. The Court will conduct this review within the next 60 days and inform you of the findings in a Merit Review Order. No other action will be taken in your case during this time, absent extraordinary circumstances. Therefore, you do not need to submit any evidence, argument, motions, or other documents. If you filed a motion for recruitment of counsel along with your complaint, it will not be considered until the merit review is complete. Please note that any motion for recruitment of counsel must include evidence of your own efforts to find counsel, such as a list of the attorneys you contacted and copies of letters you sent or received. See Pruitt v. Mote, 503 F.3d 647, 654-55 (7th Cir. 2007). If you do not receive a Merit Review Order within the next 60 days, you may file a motion requesting the status of your case. In the event your claim(s) survive the merit review, further information and instruction will be provided to you at that time. In addition, several administrative matters warrant mention. Any communication directed to the Court should be in the form of a motion or other pleading and not a letter. All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within fourteen days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge Staci M. Yandle on 5/6/2024. (kare) |
|
2 | 2
![]() MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Antwon Manning. (kare) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Ryan A. Kilduff, filed by Antwon Manning.(kare) |