South Dakota District Court
Judge:Charles B Kornmann
Case #: 4:24-cv-04084
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 4:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By
Heather Lammers Bogard
Costello Porter Hill Heisterkamp Bushnell & Carpenter
contact info
Plaintiff
Jessica L. Fessler
Represented By
Michael D. Bornitz
Cutler Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Ryan S. Armstrong
Cutler Law Firm, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Steven C. Fessler
201 South Dewberry Circle
Sioux Falls, SD 57110


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
23 23 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines Mon 03/17 12:05 PM
SECOND AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER granting22 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 12/1/2025; Motions due by 1/5/2026; Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 2/27/2026 at 01:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 3/14/2025. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
22 22 motion Extend Deadlines Fri 03/07 4:02 PM
Second MOTION to Extend Deadlines (Joint) by Jessica L. Fessler, Steven C. Fessler. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Bifurcate Wed 01/22 11:26 AM
ORDER denying16 Motion to Bifurcate.. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 1/17/2025. (DJP)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
20 20 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Extend Deadlines Thu 12/26 1:57 PM
AMENDED RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER RE:18 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for First Amended Scheduling Order: Discovery due by 5/30/2025; Motions due by 6/30/2025. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2025 at 01:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 12/21/2024. (DJP) Modified to remove italics on 12/26/2024 (DJP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
19 19 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/11 3:38 PM
PROPOSED ORDER by Jessica L. Fessler, Steven C. Fessler re18 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for First Amended Scheduling Order (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extend Deadlines Wed 12/11 3:37 PM
Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines for First Amended Scheduling Order by Jessica L. Fessler, Steven C. Fessler. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Proposed Order Wed 12/11 2:40 PM
PROPOSED ORDER by Geico Indemnity Company re16 Joint MOTION to Bifurcate (Bogard, Heather)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Bifurcate Wed 12/11 2:39 PM
Joint MOTION to Bifurcate by Geico Indemnity Company. (Bogard, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/24 10:44 AM
ANSWER to 14 Amended Complaint, by Geico Indemnity Company. (Bogard, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
14 14 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/03 4:01 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Jessica L. Fessler. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - May 8, 2023 Letter to Geico,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - July 14, 2023 Letter to Geico,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 4, 2024 Letter to Geico
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 09/03 2:15 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Amended Complaint. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 09/03/2024. (KLE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
12 12 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/28 8:59 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by Jessica L. Fessler. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - [proposed] Amended Complaint
Monday, July 01, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/01 5:02 PM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/31/2025; Motions due by 4/30/2025. TELEPHONIC Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2025 at 01:00 PM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 7 1-2024 (DJP)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Discovery Report Mon 07/01 3:37 PM
Discovery Report by Jessica L. Fessler.(Armstrong, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (attorney use) Mon 06/10 12:32 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Geico Indemnity Company. (McCoy, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2024
8 8 3 pgs order Order for Discovery Report Thu 05/30 3:12 PM
ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Charles B. Kornmann on 05/30/2024.(KLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter to Counsel from Judge Kornmann dated 05/30/2024
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/29 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lammers Bogard on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company. (Bogard, Heather)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/29 3:16 PM
ANSWER to 1 with Jury Demand by Geico Indemnity Company. (Bogard, Heather)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
5 5 misc Letter (attorney use) Wed 05/22 2:03 PM
Letter to Judge Kornmann. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Memorandum Letter Mon 05/13 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM LETTER (KLE)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Admission of Service Mon 05/13 9:26 AM
ADMISSION of Service of Summons and Complaint with Exhibits A-C served on Larry Deiter, South Dakota Director of Division of Insurance, on behalf of Geico Indemnity Company on May 8, 2024, filed by Jessica L. Fessler. (Bornitz, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 05/06 10:51 AM
Summons Issued as to Geico Indemnity Company. 1 Summons(es) delivered via electronic delivery to counsel. CLERK'S NOTICE: Fed. R. Civ. P. 73 requires that all parties be notified of the opportunity to consent to have a magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in civil cases. All parties must return the signed AO85 form to the Clerk's Office before the case is reassigned to a magistrate judge. DO NOT electronically file or return the signed form to the District Judge. The AO85 form can be found by clicking here: [LINK:National Forms: https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (JMS)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (COURT USE ONLY) Mon 05/06 10:39 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, $405.00 fee paid, receipt# ASDDC-4276606, in shell case on 05/06/2024 filed by Jessica L. Fessler. (JMS)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - May 8, 2023 Letter to Geico,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - July 14, 2023 Letter to Geico,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 4, 2024 Letter to Geico