Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-00693

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-00089
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
LORD PINDER NATION
18420 WEST SOLANO DRIVE
LITCHFIELD PARK, AZ 85340
Represented By
LORD PINDER NATION
contact info
Plaintiff
Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC, Plaintiff
Attn: Anthony W. Austin 2394 E. Camelback Rd., Ste. 600
Phoenix, AZ 85016
Represented By
ANTHONY W. AUSTIN
Fennemore Craig
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, March 03, 2025
23 23 order oGranting Mon 03/03 2:20 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 3/3/2025 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
22 22 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 02/26 2:53 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 21 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
21 21 other Stipulation Wed 02/26 2:52 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Fourth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION, Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
20 20 order oApproving Thu 12/19 3:43 PM
Fourth ORDER Extending Response Deadline as Amended by the Court signed on 12/19/2024 Related [+] . (MAT)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation,19 Order Approving
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 order oApproving Tue 12/17 1:23 PM
Fourth ORDER Extending Response Deadline As Amended by the Court signed on 12/17/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
18 18 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 12/10 9:49 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 other Stipulation Tue 12/10 9:48 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Third) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION, Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 order oGranting Wed 09/18 10:39 AM
Third ORDER Extending Response Deadline As Amended by the Court, signed on 9/18/2024 Related [+] . (ETS) Modified text on 9/18/2024 (ETS)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Monday, September 16, 2024
15 15 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 09/16 12:15 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
14 14 other Stipulation Mon 09/16 12:14 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Second) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION, Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
13 13 order oApproving Wed 08/21 10:16 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 8/21/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 07/16 12:18 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
11 11 other Stipulation Tue 07/16 12:17 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION, Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
10 10 order oExtend Wed 06/26 9:22 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline Related [+] signed on 6/26/2024 . (SJF)
Related: [-] 4
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
9 9 other Certificate of Service and No Objections Tue 06/25 11:52 AM
Certificate of Service and No Objections and Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION. Related [+](AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend,5 Declaration,6 Certificate of Service,7 Notice of Bar Date,8 Certificate of Service
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
8 8 other Certificate of Service Tue 06/11 6:43 PM
Certificate of Service filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION. Related [+] (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Bar Date
Friday, June 07, 2024
7 7 notice Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of) Fri 06/07 8:46 PM
Notice of Bar Date for Filing Responses to Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION Related [+] Objections/Responses due by 6/21/2024,.(AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend,5 Declaration
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 other Certificate of Service Wed 06/05 6:32 PM
Certificate of Service via Email filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION. Related [+] (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend,5 Declaration
5 5 other Declaration Wed 06/05 6:27 PM
Declaration of Lord Pindernation in Support of Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION. Related [+] (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 4 Motion to Extend
4 4 motion Extend (Motion to) Wed 06/05 6:26 PM
Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of LORD PINDER NATION. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 05/06 7:38 AM
Summons Issued . (SAL)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/03 1:15 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN of FENNEMORE CRAIG on behalf of Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC. (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 1:09 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00089. Complaint (350.00 fee) against LORD PINDER NATION filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN of FENNEMORE CRAIG on behalf of Sub4 Development Company of Arizona, LLC Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) COMPLAINT FOR NONDISCHARGEABILITY OF DEBT UNDER 11 U.S.C. § 523 . (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]