Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-00693

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-00091
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lord Pinder Nation
Represented By
Lord Pinder Nation
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Valle
1850 N. Central Avenue, #1200
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
LAWRENCE E. WILK
Jaburg Wilk, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Angel Duran
1850 N. Central Avenue, #1200
Phoenix, AZ 85004
Represented By
LAWRENCE E. WILK
Jaburg Wilk, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MST
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 order oApproving Tue 03/11 11:50 AM
ORDER Extending Deadline signed on 3/10/2025 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
18 18 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 03/04 12:41 AM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Lord Pinder Nation Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 other Stipulation Tue 03/04 12:40 AM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Fifth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Angel Duran, Lord Pinder Nation, Luis Valle. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
16 16 order oApproving Tue 12/17 1:25 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 12/17/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 12/11 1:43 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Lord Pinder Nation Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
14 14 other Stipulation Wed 12/11 1:41 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Fourth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Angel Duran, Lord Pinder Nation, Luis Valle. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 order oGranting Wed 09/18 10:35 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 9/18/2024 Related [+] . (ETS)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Monday, September 16, 2024
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 09/16 12:06 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Lord Pinder Nation Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
11 11 other Stipulation Mon 09/16 12:05 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Third) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Angel Duran, Lord Pinder Nation, Luis Valle. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
10 10 order oApproving Wed 08/21 10:20 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 8/21/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
9 9 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 07/17 5:25 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Lord Pinder Nation Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
8 8 other Stipulation Wed 07/17 5:24 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Second) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Angel Duran, Lord Pinder Nation, Luis Valle. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 order oGranting Tue 06/18 1:10 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 6/18/2024 Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
6 6 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 06/05 7:05 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Lord Pinder Nation Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
5 5 other Stipulation Wed 06/05 7:02 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Angel Duran, Lord Pinder Nation, Luis Valle. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
4 4 other Certificate of Service Tue 05/14 4:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Adversary Complaint filed by Corrinne R Viola of Jaburg Wilk, P.C. on behalf of Angel Duran, Luis Valle. (Viola, Corrinne)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 05/06 8:26 AM
Summons Issued . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/03 2:06 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by LAWRENCE E. WILK of Jaburg Wilk, P.C. on behalf of Luis Valle. (WILK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 1:54 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00091. Complaint (350.00 fee) against Lord Pinder Nation filed by LAWRENCE E. WILK of Jaburg Wilk, P.C. on behalf of Luis Valle, Angel Duran Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) 68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury) . (WILK, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]