Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-00693

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Eddward P Ballinger Jr
Case #: 2:24-ap-00095
Nature of Suit62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MICHAEL P. PINDER
aka Lord Pindernation 18420 WEST SOLANO DRIVE
LITCHFIELD PARK, AZ 85340
Represented By
MICHAEL P. PINDER
contact info
Plaintiff
Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc.
Represented By
MARVIN C. RUTH
Coppersmith Brockelman PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:05 PM MST
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 order oGranting Mon 03/03 2:22 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 3/3/2025 Related [+] . (RIV)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
18 18 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Wed 02/26 10:22 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of MICHAEL P. PINDER Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
17 17 other Stipulation Wed 02/26 10:20 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Fifth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
16 16 order oApproving Tue 12/17 1:23 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 12/17/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
15 15 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 12/10 10:03 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of MICHAEL P. PINDER Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
14 14 other Stipulation Tue 12/10 10:01 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Complaint (Fourth) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
13 13 order oGranting Wed 09/18 10:41 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 9/18/2024 Related [+] . (ETS)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
12 12 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 09/17 1:15 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of MICHAEL P. PINDER Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
11 11 other Stipulation Tue 09/17 12:55 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Third) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
10 10 order oApproving Wed 08/21 10:19 AM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 8/21/2024 Related [+] . (SJF)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Mon 07/15 6:13 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of MICHAEL P. PINDER Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 8 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
8 8 other Stipulation Mon 07/15 6:12 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response (Second) filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
7 7 order oGranting Tue 06/18 1:12 PM
ORDER Extending Response Deadline signed on 6/18/2024 Related [+] . (WES)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
6 6 notice Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of) Tue 06/11 1:22 PM
Notice of Lodging Proposed Order filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of MICHAEL P. PINDER Related [+]. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order
5 5 other Stipulation Tue 06/11 1:20 PM
Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Response filed by KRYSTAL MARIE AHART of KAHN & AHART, PLLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER. (AHART, KRYSTAL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
4 4 other Certificate of Service Wed 05/08 10:36 AM
Certificate of Service filed by MARVIN C. RUTH of Coppersmith Brockelman PLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc.. Related [+] (RUTH, MARVIN)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 06, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Form) Mon 05/06 8:27 AM
Summons Issued . (RDC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 03, 2024
2 2 cmp Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 05/03 3:21 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons filed by MARVIN C. RUTH of Coppersmith Brockelman PLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc.. (RUTH, MARVIN)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 3:17 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00095. Complaint (350.00 fee) against MICHAEL P. PINDER filed by MARVIN C. RUTH of Coppersmith Brockelman PLC on behalf of Acme Construction Supply Co., Inc., MICHAEL P. PINDER Nature of Suit: 62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud) Plaintiff's Complaint Against Debtor Objecting to Dischargeability of Debt . (RUTH, MARVIN)
Related: [-]