Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:22-bk-10390

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Scott H Yun
Case #: 6:24-ap-01036
Nature of Suit67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:May 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Clayton D Thom
2209 E Baseline Rd Ste 300-226
Claremont, CA 91711
Represented By
Clayton D Thom
contact info
Plaintiff
1st Valley Credit Union
2815 Mitchell Drive Suite 210
Walnut Creek, CA 94598
Represented By
Laurel A Adams
Ferns Adams And Associates
contact info
Amanda N Ferns
Ferns Adams & Associates
contact info
Trustee
Charles W Daff (TR)
2107 N. Broadway Suite 308
Santa Ana, CA 92706
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (RS)
3801 University Avenue, Suite 720
Riverside, CA 92501


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, February 28, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 02/28 9:17 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 05/22/2025 at 09:30 AM 3420 Twelfth StreetCourtroom 302Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by 1st Valley Credit Union
Thursday, February 27, 2025
17 17 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 02/28 9:16 AM
Document, Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 5/22/2025 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
Monday, January 13, 2025
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 01/13 9:56 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 02/27/2025 at 09:30 AM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by 1st Valley Credit Union
Thursday, January 09, 2025
16 16 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Mon 01/13 9:55 AM
Document, Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 2/27/2025 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
15 15 misc Status report Wed 01/08 10:26 AM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union Related [+]. (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-] Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case)
Saturday, November 23, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 11/23 9:21 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 11/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Friday, November 22, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 11/22 11:20 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 01/09/2025 at 09:30 AM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by 1st Valley Credit Union
Thursday, November 21, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 11/22 11:19 AM
Document, Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 1/9/2025 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
12 12 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Thu 11/21 1:06 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) Clayton D Thom Related [+] (SM6)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Thu 11/21 9:26 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Clayton D Thom Filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union. (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Amanda N. Ferns in Support of Entry of Default
Att: 2 Proof of Service of Document
Saturday, August 03, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 08/03 9:20 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/03/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice that Clerk Has Not Entered Default (BNC)
Friday, August 02, 2024
court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 08/02 10:51 AM
Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Related [+] Status Hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 at 09:30 AM 3420 Twelfth Street Courtroom 302 Riverside, CA 92501 for1 , (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 COMPLAINT filed by 1st Valley Credit Union
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 court Hearing Rescheduled/Continued (Other) (AP Case) Fri 08/02 10:50 AM
Document, Hearing Continued Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
8 8 misc Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk (BNC) Thu 08/01 12:21 PM
Notice That a Default Has Not Been Entered by the Clerk Against Defendant(s) Clayton D Thom Related [+] (SM6)
Related: [-] 6 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
7 7 misc Status report Wed 07/31 5:11 PM
Status report Filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union Related [+]. (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-] 3 Summons Issued
6 6 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 07/31 5:04 PM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to Clayton D Thorn Filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union. (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/29 4:41 PM
Summons Service Executed on Clayton D Thom 5/10/2024 (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
4 4 misc Errata Mon 05/06 5:37 PM
Errata Filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union Related [+]. (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 court Summons Issued Mon 05/06 1:30 PM
Summons Issued on Clayton D Thom Date Issued 5/6/2024, Answer Due 6/5/2024 Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 8/1/2024 at 09:30 AM at Crtrm 302, 3420 Twelfth St., Riverside, CA 92501. The case judge is Scott H. Yun (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 05/06 1:27 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Electronic signature does not correspond to the attorney login. THE FILER IS INSTRUCTED TO COMPLY WITH SECTION 1-03 OF THE CENTRAL GUIDE AND EITHER REFILE THE DOCUMENT WITH THE CORRECT LOGIN OR FILE A SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Related [+] (SM6)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff 1st Valley Credit Union
Friday, May 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/03 9:44 PM
Adversary case 6:24-ap-01036. Complaint by 1st Valley Credit Union against Clayton D Thom. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)),(68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)) (Ferns, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Adversary Cover Sheet
Att: 2 Summons to be Issued