Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc. v. Piedmont Natural Gas Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-21148
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-21148
California Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Christopher M Klein |
Case #: | 2:24-ap-02129 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 03, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Piedmont Natural Gas Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc.
9785 Goethe Road
Sacramento, CA 95827 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Close Adversary Proceeding
Fri 10/04 8:41 AM
Adversary Proceeding 2:24-ap-2129 Closed (smis) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.) |
|
Monday, September 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (smis) |
|
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Dismissal (smis) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:1 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 24-02129 by Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc. against Piedmont Natural Gas Company, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348613) (smis) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 1/22/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas) |
|
Thursday, June 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Order to Reschedule Status Conference Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 9/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis) Modified on 6/14/2024 (smis) |
|
Thursday, May 09, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (msts) |
|
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Exhibit(s) Re:1 Complaint (smis) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (smis) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (smis) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 7/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (smis) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (smis) |
|
1 | 1
![]() (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) : Complaint 24-02129 by Matheson Flight Extenders, Inc. against Piedmont Natural Gas Company, Inc.. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7348613) (smis) |