Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Susan Paradise Baxter
Case #: 1:24-cv-00120
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1601 Truth in Lending
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 7:43 AM EDT
Defendant
ANTHONY BLAKESLEE
Represented By
Christopher W. Cahillane
Tucker Arensberg
contact info
Defendant
KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
Christopher W. Cahillane
Tucker Arensberg
contact info
Plaintiff
GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE
APT 1
JAMESTOWN, NY 14701

GPO Nov 22 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/22/2024. (snc)

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
41 41 respoth Response in Opposition Tue 01/28 4:53 PM
Plaintiff's RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to40 Response in Opposition, filed by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (ert)
Related: [-]
40 40 respoth Response in Opposition Tue 01/28 8:56 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to38 Motion to Continue, filed by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
39 39 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support - Other Tue 01/21 3:11 PM
BRIEF in Support of38 MOTION to Continue filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Continue Tue 01/21 3:10 PM
MOTION to Continue to Trial by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
37 37 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 01/20 12:43 PM
BRIEF in Opposition re36 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
36 36 motion Leave to File Tue 01/14 1:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to File and Attach Amended Complaint to33 by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert) (sms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (1/14/2025) Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, January 03, 2025
35 35 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint Fri 01/03 1:01 PM
TEXT ORDER: AND NOW, this 3rd day of January 2025; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, ECF No.33 , is denied without prejudice due to Plaintiff's failure to attach proposed amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 1/3/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (snc)
Related: [-]
34 34 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/03 9:49 AM
BRIEF in Opposition re33 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
33 33 motion Leave to File Amended Complaint Tue 12/31 4:19 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (elt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
32 32 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 12/24 11:55 AM
BRIEF in Support re31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) filed by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
31 31 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 12/24 11:54 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) re30 Amended Complaint by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, December 20, 2024
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 12/20 10:21 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 12/20 10:24 AM
Update Answer Deadline: Answer due from KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, ANTHONY BLAKESLEE on 1/3/2025 (ert)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion for Judgment Fri 11/22 4:11 PM
ORDER: AND NOW, this 22nd day of November 2024; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss or for more definite statement, ECF No.8 , is granted in part and dismissed in part. The motion for more definite statement is granted and Plaintiff is hereby ordered to file an amended complaint. The motion is dismissed in all other regards but may be renewed following the filing of the amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint in accordance with the instructions in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion by December 20, 2024. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/22/2024. (snc)
Related: [-]
28 28 3 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Fri 11/22 4:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 11/22/2024. (snc)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set Deadlines Fri 11/22 4:15 PM
*Set deadlines. See ECF No.29 . (snc)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
27 27 motion Judgment Fri 10/18 4:55 PM
Supplement to25 REPLY to the Response at24 re Motion to Dismiss and MOTION for Judgment by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Amended Document (NOT Motion) Do NOT use for amended complaint Fri 10/18 4:50 PM
AMENDMENT to title of previous filing pursuant to FRCP 15 by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Thursday, October 17, 2024
25 25 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 10/17 4:28 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 Reply Brief filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 respm Reply Brief Wed 10/16 9:52 AM
REPLY BRIEF re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 10/16 8:24 AM
TEXT ORDER: AND NOW, this 16th day of October, 2024, upon consideration of Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief, ECF No.22 , it is hereby ORDERED that said Motion is GRANTED. Defendants may file a reply brief in support of their Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), ECF No.8 , within ten (10) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 10/16/2024. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (snc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/15 1:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re3 Complaint MOTION for More Definite Statement by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
21 21 misc Supplement Tue 10/15 10:46 AM
Plaintiff's SUPPLEMENTAL PLEADING to3 Complaint by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
20 20 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Mon 10/07 3:17 PM
NOTICE of Amended Service Date due to Mail Size and Indigence by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mail Receipt
Monday, September 30, 2024
19 19 notice Notice (Other) - Do Not Use for ADR Documents Fri 10/04 9:46 AM
NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, Waiver of the Service of a Summons mailed to ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION on 8/6/2024 by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE re4 Order Directing Service. (ert)
Related: [-]
18 18 respoth Response in Opposition Mon 09/30 11:04 AM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION to8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement, filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Mon 09/30 10:58 AM
BRIEF in Opposition re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Subpoena E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Thursday, September 12, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 09/12 6:34 PM
ORDER: AND NOW, this 12th day of September 2024; IT IS ORDERED that Defendants' motion to deny or stay, ECF No.12 , is granted in part and denied in part. The motion is granted insofar as Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment will be dismissed as premature and is denied in all other regards. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment, ECF No.10 , is dismissed as premature. This dismissal is without prejudice to refiling at the appropriate stage of the litigation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff's motion to proceed with motion for summary judgment, ECF No.14 , is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff file a response addressing the arguments in Defendants' motion to dismiss by October 1, 2024. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 9/12/2024. (snc)
Related: [-]
15 15 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 09/12 11:36 AM
BRIEF in Support re14 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Thu 09/12 11:35 AM
MOTION to Proceed with10 MOTION for Summary Judgment by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
13 13 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 09/10 8:58 AM
BRIEF in Support re12 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
12 12 motion Miscellaneous Relief (Use ONLY if no other relief applies) Tue 09/10 8:57 AM
MOTION TO DENY AS PREMATURE OR STAY10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher) Modified text on 9/10/2024. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 29, 2024
11 11 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support - Other Thu 08/29 1:48 PM
BRIEF in Support of10 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Summary Judgment Thu 08/29 1:33 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (ert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
9 9 respm Brief / Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Tue 08/27 2:15 PM
BRIEF in Support re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim More Definite Statement Tue 08/27 2:14 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re3 Complaint, MOTION for More Definite Statement by ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 08/27 2:12 PM
Disclosure Statement identifying KeyCorp. as corporate parent or other affiliate by KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/19 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher W. Cahillane on behalf of ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION. (Cahillane, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Directing Service Mon 07/22 10:42 AM
ORDER that the U.S. Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to defendant as directed by plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 7/22/2024. (snc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
3 3 cmp Complaint (for Clerk of Court personnel only) Wed 05/08 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against ANTHONY BLAKESLEE, KEYBANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, filed by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (dmh)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/07 4:27 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff Mr. Dixie has filed a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis and has lodged a pro se complaint for filing in this district. AND NOW, this 7th day of May 2024; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, ECF No.1 , be granted. The Clerk is directed to file the lodged complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff is directed to provide to the Court completed USM285 forms for each defendant listed in his complaint so they may be properly served. USM285 forms due by June 6, 2024. Failure to do so in a timely manner may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. The plaintiff is advised that service will not be ordered until completed USM285 forms are received. The plaintiff is further advised that no Defendant is required to respond to the complaint until he or she has accepted a copy of it from the Marshal and waived service or has been served. Therefore, a Motion for Default cannot properly be filed unless the Defendant has failed to file an answer, a motion to dismiss, or a motion for additional time to respond, within sixty (60) days after the Marshal's notice has been mailed, if service is waived pursuant to the notice, or twenty (20) days after being served. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiff shall immediately advise the court of any change in address. Failure to do so may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute if the Court and other parties are unable to serve pleadings, orders and other documents upon plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan Paradise Baxter on 5/7/2024. (snc)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 05/07 8:37 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GERALD MARK ARTHUR DIXIE. (dmh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 05/06 4:30 PM
Judge Susan Paradise Baxter added. (jd)
Related: [-]