Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:David A Ruiz
Case #: 5:24-cv-00807
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Terminated:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Nov 02, 2024 5:34 AM EDT
Defendant
Ledge Lounger, Inc.
Represented By
Drew H. Campbell
Bricker Graydon - Columbus
contact info
Scott A. Burow
Banner & Witcoff - Chicago
contact info
Christian T. Wolfgram
Banner & Witcoff - Chicago
contact info
Matthew P. Becker
Banner & Witcoff - Chicago
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Anderson
Represented By
Matthew P. Becker
Banner & Witcoff - Chicago
contact info
Plaintiff
Step2 Company, LLC
Represented By
Paul J. Linden
Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati
contact info
John F. Bennett
Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati
contact info
Ava M. Bowden
Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati
contact info
Ava M. Abner
Frost Brown Todd - Cincinnati
contact info


Docket last updated: 48 minutes ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
25 25 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Thu 03/20 4:16 PM
Report on the Determination [Closing] of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120). (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order Dismissing Case
Thursday, March 13, 2025
24 24 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 03/13 6:06 PM
Order of Case Dismissal. In accordance with Plaintiff's notice of voluntary dismissal, (R.23 ), this case is dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/13/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim Thu 03/13 6:12 PM
Order [non-document] denying as moot Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying as moot Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.9 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim; denying as moot Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.16 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying as moot Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.16 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim; denying as moot Defendant Christopher Anderson's17 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction; denying as moot Defendant Christopher Anderson17 Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Judge David A. Ruiz on 3/13/2025. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Dismissal Mon 03/10 2:43 PM
Notice of Dismissal Under FRCP 41(a)(1) with Prejudice filed by Step2 Company, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
22 22 resp Reply Thu 10/17 4:59 PM
Reply in support of17 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Christopher Anderson. (Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Thu 10/10 4:28 PM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's19 Motion for extension of time until 10/8/2024 to file response/reply to17 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim. Judge David A. Ruiz on 10/10/2024. (G,CA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
21 21 resp Reply Wed 10/09 3:58 PM
Reply in support of16 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Ledge Lounger, Inc.. (Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
20 20 resp Opposition Tue 10/08 11:46 AM
Opposition to17 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Step2 Company, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 10/08 10:37 AM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until October 8, 2024 to file response/reply to17 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Step2 Company, LLC. Related document(s)17 . (Bowden, Ava)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
18 18 resp Opposition Wed 09/25 3:00 PM
Opposition to16 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Step2 Company, LLC.(Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Ledge Lounger webpage
Friday, September 06, 2024
17 17 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 09/06 4:00 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Christopher Anderson. Related document(s)13 .(Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 3, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 19, 2024 On-line form to Amazon,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 23, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - August 5, 2020 Letter of Protest Memorandum
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 08/26 5:40 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.. Related document(s)13 .(Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 3, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 19, 2024 On-line form to Amazon,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 23, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - August 5, 2020 Letter of Protest Memorandum
Friday, August 23, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Fri 08/23 10:02 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Amended Complaint addressed to Christopher Anderson placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: Certified Mail. Receipt # 7021 1970 0001 7998 3769. (B,DL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
15 15 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 08/20 9:00 AM
Original Summons issued to counsel for service upon Christopher Anderson. (R,AP)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
14 14 oth_doc Praecipe Mon 08/19 4:13 PM
Praecipe for issuance of Original Summons filed by Step2 Company, LLC.(Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons to Christopher Anderson
Monday, August 12, 2024
13 13 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/12 5:45 PM
First Amended complaint against Ledge Lounger, Inc., Christopher Anderson and adding new party defendant(s) Christopher Anderson. Filed by Step2 Company, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Advantus Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 905 Registration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - 975 Patent,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Global Pool Products Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Step2 Petition
Monday, July 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for extension of time to file response/reply to motion Mon 07/29 9:22 AM
Order [non-document] granting Plaintiff's12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff Step2 Company, LLC shall respond to Defendant's9 Motion to Dismiss on or before 08/12/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 7/29/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Fri 07/26 7:51 PM
Unopposed Motion for extension of time until 08/12/2024 to file response/reply to9 Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction, and Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Plaintiff Step2 Company, LLC. Related document(s)9 . (Abner, Ava)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 oth_doc Report Regarding Patent or Trademark Action - AO120 Fri 07/12 11:35 AM
Report on the Filing of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (AO120) filed by Step2 Company, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Mon 07/08 5:24 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Ledge Lounger, Inc.. (Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/08 5:20 PM
Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc..(Becker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - April 3, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - April 19, 2024 On-line form to Amazon,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - April 23, 2024 Correspondence,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Page Vault capture of Amazons Intellectual Property Policy for Sellers,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Page Vault capture of Amazon Services Business Solutions Agreement
Friday, June 28, 2024
oth_evt Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements Fri 06/28 2:16 PM
Notice of Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Local Rule 3.13(c) requires the filing of the [LINK:AO121 Copyright Report Form] or AO120 Patent and Trademark Report Form by 7/12/2024. (M,CE)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 06/21 12:05 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's6 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Christian T. Wolfgram for Ledge Lounger, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 6/21/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 06/21 12:48 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's7 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Matthew P. Becker for Ledge Lounger, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 6/21/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to appear pro hac vice Fri 06/21 12:53 PM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's8 Motion for appearance pro hac vice by attorney Scott A. Burow for Ledge Lounger, Inc. Local Rule 5.1(c) requires that attorneys register for NextGen CM/ECF and file and receive all documents electronically. NextGen CM/ECF registration can be done online at www.pacer.gov. Login with your PACER credentials, go to the Maintenance tab, click Attorney Admissions/E-File Registration, select Ohio Northern District Court and then select Pro Hac Vice. If you were previously granted pro hac vice status and are already registered to file electronically, it is not necessary to register again. Judge David A. Ruiz on 6/21/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
8 8 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 4:42 PM
Motion for attorney Scott A. Burow to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12592836, filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc..(Campbell, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (Burow)
7 7 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 4:39 PM
Motion for attorney Matthew P. Becker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12592819, filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc..(Campbell, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (Becker)
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 4:36 PM
Motion for attorney Christian T. Wolfgram to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Filing fee $ 120, receipt number AOHNDC-12592799, filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc..(Campbell, Drew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing (Wolfgram)
order Order on Motion for extension of time to answer Thu 06/06 11:49 AM
Order [non-document] granting Defendant's5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc. shall answer, plead, or otherwise move in response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 07/08/2024. Judge David A. Ruiz on 6/6/2024. (K,MJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
5 5 motion Extension (answer complaint) Tue 06/04 4:06 PM
Motion for extension of time until July 8, 2024 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Ledge Lounger, Inc.. Related document(s)1 . (Campbell, Drew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
4 4 service Return of Service Executed Thu 05/23 11:46 AM
Return of Service by Clerk by certified mail executed upon Ledge Lounger, Inc. on 5/17/2024, delivery date verified with U.S. Postal Service website, filed on behalf of Step2 Company, LLC. Related document(s)2 . (C,RD)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
oth_evt Service by Clerk Mon 05/13 8:33 AM
Service by Clerk. Summons and Complaint addressed to Ledge Lounger, Inc. placed in U.S. Mail. Type of service: certified mail. Receipt # 7022 1670 0003 3774 9161. (P,G)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
3 3 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement (atty event) Wed 05/08 4:37 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Step2 Company, LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
2 2 oth_evt Summons Issued Tue 05/07 9:19 AM
Original Summons and Magistrate Consent Form issued to counsel for service upon Ledge Lounger, Inc. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent Form
utility Add and Terminate Judge Tue 05/07 8:58 AM
Judge David A. Ruiz assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Tue 05/07 9:06 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Reuben J. Sheperd. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
1 1 16 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 05/06 6:33 PM
Complaint with jury demand against Ledge Lounger Inc.. Filing fee paid $ 405, Receipt number AOHNDC-12544875.. Filed by The Step2 Company LLC. (Bennett, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Advantus Notice,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - 905 Registration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Global Pool Products Petition,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Step2 Petition,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Summons