Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen C Dries
Case #: 2:24-cv-00555
Nature of Suit864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, February 14, 2025
23 23 order Judgment Fri 02/14 4:07 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 2/14/2025. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
22 22 10 pgs order Order Fri 02/14 3:38 PM
DECISION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 2/14/2025. IT IS ORDERED that the Commissioner's decision is AFFIRMED. (cc: all counsel)(amb)
Related: [-]
notice 1-Notice re Social Security Comm Fri 02/14 3:37 PM
NOTICE to Counsel: Michelle A. King was sworn in as Acting Commissioner of Social Security on January 20, 2025. Pursuant to Rule 25(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Michelle A. King is substituted as the defendant in this suit. No further action need be taken to continue this suit by reason of the last sentence of section 205(g) of the Social Security Act, 42 U.S.C. 405(g). (amb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
21 21 socsec Plaintiffs Reply Brief - Social Security Wed 11/20 9:55 PM
Plaintiffs Reply Brief by Kenneth Whitaker. (Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
20 20 socsec Commissioners Brief - Social Security Tue 11/05 2:16 PM
Commissioners Brief filed by Martin J O'Malley. (Yarnell, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/17 7:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Charles Yarnell on behalf of Martin J O'Malley. Attorney(s) appearing: Eric Yarnell (Yarnell, Eric)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
18 18 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/03 9:13 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 10/3/24. The court GRANTS defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No.16 . Defendant's brief is due November 6, 2024 ; plaintiff's reply is due November 20, 2024 . (cc: all counsel) (mmk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
17 17 misc Declaration Wed 10/02 5:53 PM
DECLARATION of David Levitt (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Extension of Time Wed 10/02 5:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Second by Martin J O'Malley.(Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 09/04 3:29 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen C Dries on 9/4/24. The court GRANTS defendant's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, ECF No.13 . Defendant's brief is due October 7, 2024 ; plaintiff's reply is due October 21, 2024 . (cc: all counsel) (mmk)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Declaration Wed 09/04 11:10 AM
DECLARATION of David Levitt (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Extension of Time Wed 09/04 11:08 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time by Martin J O'Malley.(Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/04 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David Levitt on behalf of Martin J O'Malley. Attorney(s) appearing: David Levitt (Levitt, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
11 11 socsec Plaintiffs Brief - Social Security Wed 08/07 4:00 PM
Plaintiffs Brief by Kenneth Whitaker. (Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
10 10 socsec Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript Mon 07/08 8:25 AM
Notice of Filing Administrative Transcript and Preservation of Rights filed by Martin J O'Malley. (Pawlak, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Transcript
9 9 socsec Certificate of Service - Social Security Transcript Mon 07/08 8:24 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Social Security Transcript by Martin J O'Malley (Pawlak, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge on Consent Fri 05/10 4:37 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE ON CONSENT signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/10/2024. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Dries for all further proceedings. Chief Judge Pamela Pepper no longer assigned to case. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
7 7 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 05/09 1:58 PM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Martin J O'Malley. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Pawlak, Brian)
Related: [-]
6 6 socsec Briefing Letter Thu 05/09 10:43 AM
Briefing Letter electronically transmitted to parties: Defendant to file and serve certified administrative record by 7/8/2024 ; Plaintiff's brief due 8/7/2024 ; Defendant's response due 9/6/2024 ; Plaintiff's reply due 9/20/2024 . (cc: all counsel) (cb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Wed 05/08 8:58 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Kenneth Whitaker. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement Wed 05/08 8:57 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Kenneth Whitaker. (Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
socsec Notice - Action Commenced Wed 05/08 10:11 AM
Notice of Service - Pursuant to Rule 3 of the Supplemental Rules for Social Security Actions under 42 U.S.C. § 405(g), the Clerk has electronically notified via CM/ECF the Social Security Administration Office of the General Counsel and the United States Attorney's Office of the filing of this case. (edr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
3 3 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 05/07 5:23 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Pamela Pepper on 5/7/2024 GRANTING2 plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed without prepaying filing fee. (cc: all counsel)(cb)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee Tue 05/07 2:38 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Kenneth Whitaker. (Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Tue 05/07 8:19 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge Pamela Pepper. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] Pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed. (mew)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint - Social Security Mon 05/06 8:07 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration filed by Kenneth Whitaker(Brzezinski, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet