New York Southern District Court
Judge:J Paul Oetken
Referred: Robyn F Tarnofsky
Case #: 1:24-cv-03503
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e-2e Job Discrimination (Unlawful Employment Practices)
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 4:11 AM EST
Defendant
Jonathan Adler
Represented By
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Defendant
Michael Dabah
Represented By
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Defendant
Adam Stein
Represented By
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Defendant
Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP
Represented By
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Defendant
Joshua Zelkowitz
Represented By
Noah Hertz Bunzl
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Lisia Lynette Leon
Paduano & Weintraub LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Debra Mandl
Represented By
Tiffany Ma
Young & Ma LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
42 42 misc Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 11/20 5:46 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Debra Mandl. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
40 40 order Order Mon 11/04 8:52 AM
ORDER re:38 Status Report. The parties shall file a joint update on the status but not the substance of their settlement efforts by December 2, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky) (Text Only Order) (ah)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
39 39 order Order Fri 11/01 5:29 PM
ORDER The parties shall file a joint update on the status but not the substance of their settlement efforts by December 2, 2024. (HEREBY ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky) (Text Only Order) (ah)
Related: [-]
38 38 misc Status Report Fri 11/01 3:57 PM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 10/10 2:42 PM
ORDER denying as moot21 Motion to Dismiss: On August 13, 2024, Mandl filed an amended complaint in which she did not allege claims under NYEPA or the FMLA. (ECF No. 29.) Because Mandl no longer alleges the claims at issue in Defendants motion to dismiss, the Court denies the motion as moot. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 10/10/2024) (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
minutes Mediation Conference Tue 10/08 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before SDNY Mediation: Mediation Conference held on 10/7/2024. Mediation Status due by 11/6/2024. (sni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
36 36 misc Status Report Wed 10/02 11:26 AM
STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Bunzl, Noah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
adr Mediation Conference Scheduled Thu 09/12 2:39 PM
FIRST MEDIATION CONFERENCE. Mediation Conference scheduled for 10/7/2024 at 10:00 AM in telephone or video conference.(sni)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
35 35 order Case Management Plan Wed 09/11 10:34 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND REPORT OF RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE: As discussed at the initial case management conference, the parties' case management plan and schedule is GRANTED with the following modification. The parties shall provide joint monthly updates on the status of discovery and on the status but not the substance of their settlement talks. The monthly updates will be due on the first business day of each month, beginning on October 2, 2024. The parties anticipate that the trial of this case will require 5 days. The parties request a jury trial. The parties do not consent to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction at this time. Amended Pleadings due by 9/16/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 9/16/2024. Deposition due by 3/24/2025. Fact Discovery due by 4/7/2025. Expert Discovery due by 6/10/2025. Ready for Trial by 9/1/2025. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 9/11/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
34 34 minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 09/10 12:21 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky: Initial Conference held on 9/10/2024. (ah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
adr Notice of Mediator Assignment Wed 09/04 4:21 PM
NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 10/4/2024.(sge)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
33 33 misc Proposed Case Management Plan Tue 09/03 2:43 PM
PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
32 32 6 pgs order Order of Automatic Referral to Mediation Wed 08/28 10:29 AM
ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (https://nysd.uscourts.gov/programs/mediation-adr). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 9/11/2024. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 08/27 4:37 PM
ANSWER to29 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Bunzl, Noah)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 08/27 4:36 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Bunzl, Noah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
29 29 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/13 12:10 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Debra Mandl. Related document:1 Complaint..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 07/25 4:45 PM
ORDER granting27 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference.Application granted. The Initial Case Management Conference is adjourned until 9/10/2024 at 11:00 AM, with the proposed case management order due on 9/3/2024. Counsel for the parties are directed to call my conference line at the scheduled time by dialing (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 120 395 330 #. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/10/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 7/25/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
27 27 motion Adjourn Conference Thu 07/25 2:04 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky from Tiffany Ma dated July 25, 2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/17 2:27 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss on or before August 19, 2024. So ordered. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/16 3:58 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to21 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and VI of the Complaint . addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Tiffany Ma dated July 16, 2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order for Initial Pretrial Conference Tue 07/09 4:15 PM
INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for the parties are directed to call my conference line at the scheduled time by dialing (646) 453-4442, Access Code: 120 395 330 #. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 7/9/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
23 23 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Mon 07/08 5:27 PM
DECLARATION of Jonathan Adler in Support re:21 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and VI of the Complaint .. Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Leon, Lisia)
Related: [-]
22 22 13 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Mon 07/08 5:26 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:21 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and VI of the Complaint . . Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Leon, Lisia)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 07/08 5:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Counts IV and VI of the Complaint . Document filed by Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Leon, Lisia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Noah Hertz Bunzl on behalf of Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Bunzl, Noah)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 05/15 10:04 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lisia Lynette Leon on behalf of Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz..(Leon, Lisia)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 9:16 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Joshua Zelkowitz waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 9:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Dabah waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 9:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jonathan Adler waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Adam Stein waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/14 9:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP waiver sent on 5/9/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 05/08 5:59 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/8/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joshua Zelkowitz. (vf)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 10:43 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Dabah. (vf)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jonathan Adler. (vf)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 10:42 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Adam Stein. (vf)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 05/08 10:41 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 05/08 10:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 05/08 10:21 AM
Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 05/08 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/07 12:45 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Joshua Zelkowitz, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/07 12:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Dabah, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/07 12:37 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jonathan Adler, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/07 12:36 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Adam Stein, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 05/07 12:35 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 12:30 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 05/07 12:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Jonathan Adler, Michael Dabah, Adam Stein, Stein Adler Dabah & Zelkowitz LLP, Joshua Zelkowitz. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29321490)Document filed by Debra Mandl..(Ma, Tiffany)
Related: [-]