New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Robert M Levy
Case #: 1:24-cv-03380
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:791 Job Discrimination (Rehabilitation Act)
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 3:50 AM EST
Defendant
Martha Aspromatis
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Ysabel Macea
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Christine Mangino
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Amaris Matos
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Felix V. Matos Rodriguez
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Sangeeta Noel
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
Queensborough Community College
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
The City University of New York
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Defendant
The City of New York
Represented By
Bryan Carr Olert
New York City Law Department
contact info
Plaintiff
Jan Ramjerdi
Represented By
Cyrus E Dugger
The Dugger Law Firm, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
44 44 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 04/24 10:14 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Substitution and of Stay by Cyrus Dugger. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 04/24 2:30 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's counsel's44 consent request, on behalf of Plaintiff's estate, (i) for extension of time to file Plaintiff's estate's motion for substitution of Plaintiff; and (ii) for extension of the current stay of briefing of Defendants' motion to dismiss until June 6, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Hector Gonzalez on 4/24/2025. (NO)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
43 43 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 2:09 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Sukonnik on behalf of Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York (notification declined or already on case) (Sukonnik, Marina)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Mon 03/10 12:18 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiff's counsel's42 consent request for extension of the current stay of briefing of Defendants' motion to dismiss until May 6, 2025. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/10/2025. (NO)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
42 42 motion Stay Fri 03/07 6:36 PM
MOTION to Stay re Order on Motion to Stay, Request for Extension of Stay by Cyrus Dugger. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 02/25 8:59 PM
ORDER: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's counsel's41 request to stay all aspects of this case. The court GRANTS in part the request and STAYS further briefing of Defendants' motion to dismiss until at least March 10, 2025, but no later than May 6, 2025, which is the 90-day deadline for Plaintiff's counsel to file a motion for substitution of Plaintiff. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/25/2025. (NO)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
41 41 misc Letter Mon 02/24 10:54 PM
Letter by Cyrus Dugger (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
order Order to Show Cause Mon 02/10 1:48 PM
ORDER: The court is in receipt of Defendants'40 response to Plaintiff's counsel's39 suggestion upon the record the death of Plaintiff. The court DIRECTS Plaintiff's counsel to show cause by February 24, 2025 why Plaintiff's claims seeking declaratory, injunctive, and prospective monetary relief, as well as punitive damages should not be dismissed. Defendants may file a response by March 10, 2025 . So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/10/2025. (NO)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
40 40 misc Letter Fri 02/07 5:24 PM
Letter Response to Suggestion of Death of Plaintiff (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
39 39 misc Suggestion of Death Wed 02/05 12:32 AM
SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Plaintiff Jan Ramjerdi by Cyrus Dugger (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
order Order(Other) Wed 02/05 12:22 PM
ORDER: The court is in receipt of Plaintiff's counsel's39 suggestion upon the record the death of Plaintiff. In light of that development, the court DIRECTS the Defendants to respond to Plaintiff's counsel's suggestion by February 19, 2025 as to next steps in the litigation. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 2/5/2025. (NO)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
38 38 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Strike Wed 01/29 3:39 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Strike Class Claims by Amaris Matos, The City of New York, The City University of New York, Queensborough Community College, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Christine Mangino, Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Sangeeta Noel. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
utility Terminate Motions (filed in error) Thu 01/30 10:00 AM
Motions terminated, docketed prematurely:38 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Strike Class Claims filed by Christine Mangino, The City University of New York, Sangeeta Noel, Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, The City of New York, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Queensborough Community College, Amaris Matos. Counsel is to refile the motion once fully briefed in accordance with the established briefing schedule and the Individual Rules of Nicholas G. Garaufis. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
37 37 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 01/10 4:59 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion for Extension of Time to 4/21/2025 to file opposition and to 4/24/2025 to File Reply. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 1/10/2025. (TLH) Modified descriptive text on 1/10/2025 (TLH)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 01/10 2:32 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by Amaris Matos, The City of New York, The City University of New York, Queensborough Community College, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Christine Mangino, Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Sangeeta Noel. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
35 35 motion File Excess Pages Thu 12/19 4:57 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Amaris Matos, The City of New York, The City University of New York, Queensborough Community College, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Christine Mangino, Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Sangeeta Noel. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Thu 12/19 5:54 PM
ORDER: The court GRANTS Defendants'35 consent motion for leave to file excess pages. Defendants may file an opening brief of no more than 35 pages . Plaintiff may also submit an opposition brief of no more than 35 pages . Defendants' reply brief, if any, is set to no more than 10 pages . So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 12/19/2024. (NO)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 12/09 4:59 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re32 MOTION for pre motion conference Regarding Plaintiff's Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Liability Only on Plaintiff's FMLA Interference Claim filed by Amaris Matos, The City of New York, The City University of New York, Queensborough Community College, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Christine Mangino, Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Sangeeta Noel. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
33 33 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Tue 11/19 1:53 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Tue 11/19 3:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Cyrus Dugger, Bryan Ohlert. The question whether discovery should be stayed pending resolution of the anticipated motion to dismiss and motion for summary judgment was explored in some depth. On consent of all partie4s, discovery is stayed to avoid likely duplication of effort while the surviving claims and defenses in this case are identified and defined clearly.Initial Case Management Hearing held on 11/19/2024 (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
order Scheduling Order Tue 11/12 3:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The initial telephone conference set for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM has been moved to 3:30 PM, on the same date. . Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/12/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
32 32 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 10/31 2:25 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference Regarding Plaintiff's Proposed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Liability Only on Plaintiff's FMLA Interference Claim by Jan Ramjerdi. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
31 31 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/22 1:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference is set for 11/19/2024 at 10:30 AM before the Hon. Robert M. Levy, USMJ. Parties are directed to dial: 571-353-2301; and use Guest ID: 623827231. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/22/2024. (JM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IC Questionnaire,
Att: 2 Individual Rules
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
minutes Pre Motion Conference Wed 10/02 2:56 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis. Pre-motion conference held on October 2, 2024. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendants present. The court granted the Defendants'27 request for leave to file their anticipated motions to dismiss and to strike class claims. The court set the following schedule: Defendants' opening motion due January 15, 2025; Plaintiff's opposition due March 10, 2025; and Defendants' reply, if any, due March 28, 2025. The court directed the parties to contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy to schedule an initial conference regarding discovery. (Court Reporter: Victoria A. Torres Butler) (NO)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Thu 08/15 1:32 AM
Letter Re Pre-Motion Conference on Defendants Proposed Motion to Dismiss by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/01 12:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer nunc pro tunc pursuant to the Paragraph IV.A.3 of the Court's Rules by Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 08/01 7:13 PM
ORDER: Defendants'27 application for a pre-motion conference and29 request for an extension of time are GRANTED. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and contact the court's Deputy at Joseph_Reccoppa@nyed.uscourts.gov to schedule the pre-motion conference. Defendant's time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended through the date of the pre-motion conference. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 8/1/2024. (ER)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Carr Olert on behalf of Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York (notification declined or already on case) (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
27 27 motion Pre Motion Conference Thu 07/25 6:08 PM
First MOTION for pre motion conference regarding Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss by Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 11, 2024
26 26 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/11 2:49 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Queensborough Community College served on 5/31/2024, answer due 7/25/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 06/10 4:33 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time to 7/25/224 to Answer re23 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer All Defendants. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 6/10/2024. (Levy, Robert)
Related: [-]
Sunday, June 09, 2024
25 25 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 06/09 11:34 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Amaris Matos served on 5/30/2024, answer due 6/20/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons Returned Executed Sun 06/09 11:32 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Ysabel Macea served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 05/31 12:57 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York. (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Email Exchange
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/31 12:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bryan Carr Olert on behalf of Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York (aty to be noticed) (Olert, Bryan)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/31 9:14 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Felix V. Matos Rodriguez served on 5/21/2024, answer due 6/11/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 05/31 9:09 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Martha Aspromatis served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 25, 2024
19 19 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/25 10:08 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. The City University of New York served on 5/23/2024, answer due 6/13/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/25 7:58 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Sangeeta Noel served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/25 7:54 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. Christine Mangino served on 5/20/2024, answer due 6/10/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/25 7:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. The City of New York served on 5/16/2024, answer due 6/6/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Returned Executed Sat 05/25 7:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jan Ramjerdi. The City of New York served on 5/15/2024, answer due 6/5/2024. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued Thu 05/09 10:40 AM
Summons Issued as to Martha Aspromatis, Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York. (TLH)
Related: [-]
utility Incorrect Case-Document Information Thu 05/09 10:43 AM
Incorrect Document Information re Proposed Summons: Counsel is advised that Douglas C. Palmer is no longer the Clerk of this Court. Please update your saved form. Counsel is also advised that the full case caption is to appear on summons issued by this court. Please ensure that future proposed summonses are in compliance. (TLH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
13 13 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 05/08 3:51 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Wed 05/08 10:24 AM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (AF)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 05/08 10:22 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (AF)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Wed 05/08 10:31 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (AF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
11 11 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:19 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:17 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:15 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:13 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:11 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:08 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:06 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:05 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:03 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 05/07 11:00 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Jan Ramjerdi (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/07 10:54 PM
COMPLAINT against Ysabel Macea, Christine Mangino, Amaris Matos, Felix V. Matos Rodriguez, Sangeeta Noel, Queensborough Community College, The City University of New York, The City of New York filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-17851853 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Jan Ramjerdi. (Dugger, Cyrus)
Related: [-]