California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-03797
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1335 Interpleader Action
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 28, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 1:43 AM PDT
Cross Claimant
David Victor
Represented By
Michelle J Correll
Correll Law PA
contact info
Cross Defendant
James W Spertus
Represented By
Jessica G Babrick
Weinstock Manion Alc
contact info
Michael E Bareket
Weinstock Manion, Alc
contact info
Cross Defendant
John A. Spertus
Represented By
Jessica G Babrick
Weinstock Manion Alc
contact info
Michael E Bareket
Weinstock Manion, Alc
contact info
Defendant
James W Spertus
Spertus, Landes & Umhofer, LLP 1990 S. Bundy Dr., Suite 705
Los Angeles, CA 90025
Represented By
Jessica G Babrick
Weinstock Manion Alc
contact info
Michael E Bareket
Weinstock Manion, Alc
contact info
Defendant
David Victor
Represented By
Michelle J Correll
Correll Law PA
contact info
Defendant
Michael Victor
Represented By
Michelle J Correll
Correll Law PA
contact info
Defendant
John A. Spertus
Represented By
Jessica G Babrick
Weinstock Manion Alc
contact info
Michael E Bareket
Weinstock Manion, Alc
contact info
Plaintiff
American General Life Insurence Company
Represented By
Randi Perry Spallina
Bressler Amery And Ross, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
31 31 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Clear Flags ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 08/28 2:07 PM
ORDER ON STIPULATION RE ANNUITY AND STAY OF CASE by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani, re Stipulation to Stay Case29 (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
30 30 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/22 8:46 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Michael Victor, identifying American General Life Insurance Co., David Victor, Michael Victor, John A. Spertus, James W. Spertus, Edward G. Victor Revocable Trust. (Attorney Michelle J Correll added to party Michael Victor(pty:dft))(Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
29 29 stip Stay Case Wed 08/21 6:40 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Resolution of State Court Cases filed by Defendant James W Spertus.(Bareket, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
28 28 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Thu 08/08 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants & Cross-Defendants James W Spertus, John A. Spertus, (Bareket, Michael)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Response By Court to Notice of Deficiencies (G-112B) - optional html form Thu 08/08 8:47 AM
RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN FILED DOCUMENT RE: Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A)26 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. A notice of interested parties shall be filed no later than 5 days from entry of this Order. (gga)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
26 26 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 07/31 12:10 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Answer to Complaint25 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7-1.1 no notice of interested parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/29 11:21 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Defendants James W Spertus, John A. Spertus.(Bareket, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
24 24 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/15 12:07 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by cross-claimant David Victor. upon John A. Spertus waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/15/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael E. Bareket Esq. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 07/15 12:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by cross-claimant David Victor. upon James W Spertus waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/15/2024, answer due 9/13/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michael E. Bareket Esq. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
22 22 respm Notice of Motion Wed 07/10 8:48 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Outcome of Superior Court Litigation 17 filed by Defendant David Victor. Motion set for hearing on 9/12/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
21 21 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/09 12:45 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company. upon Michael Victor waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/9/2024, answer due 9/9/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Michelle Corell. (Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
20 20 cs_rasgn Returning Case for Reassignment w/i division (CV-89) Mon 07/08 4:47 PM
ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 23-05. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-03797 MRA(JPRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Declaration (Motion related) Mon 07/08 10:21 AM
DECLARATION of Eric M. Tokuyama and Michelle J. Correll in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Outcome of Superior Court Litigation 17 filed by Defendant David Victor. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
18 18 25 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Mon 07/08 10:18 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Outcome of Superior Court Litigation 17 filed by Defendant David Victor. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Stay Case Mon 07/08 10:17 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Outcome of Superior Court Litigation filed by defendant David Victor. Motion set for hearing on 8/12/2024 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Fri 07/05 3:40 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Dean D. Pregerson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-03797 DDP(JPRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
15 15 notice Notice (Other) Wed 07/03 10:17 AM
Notice filed by defendant David Victor. Notice of Pendency of Other Actions - L.R. 83-1.4 (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
14 14 cmp Crossclaim Wed 07/03 10:14 AM
CROSSCLAIM against cross-defendants James W Spertus, John A. Spertus; Jury Demand, filed by cross-claimant David Victor.(Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 07/03 10:12 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant David Victor.(Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
12 12 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Mon 06/10 4:49 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 06/03 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant David Victor, identifying American General Life Insurance Company, David Victor, Michael Victor, James Spertus, John Spertus, Edward G. Victor Revocable Trust. (Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 06/03 5:06 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to David Victor answer now due 7/5/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by defendant David Victor.(Attorney Michelle J Correll added to party David Victor(pty:dft))(Correll, Michelle)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/28 3:37 PM
John A. Spertus WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by DEFENDANT John A. Spertus. upon John A. Spertus waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/28/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Spertus. (Rummel, Blake)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 05/28 3:32 PM
James A Spertus WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed James W Spertus. upon James W Spertus waiver sent by Plaintiff on 5/28/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. (Rummel, Blake)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2024
7 7 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Wed 05/22 12:53 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company, upon Defendant David Victor served on 5/17/2024, answer due 6/7/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon David Victor, Defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Tue 05/14 10:20 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 as to Defendant James W Spertus, John A. Spertus, David Victor, Michael Victor. (es)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
5 5 notice Summons Request Mon 05/13 12:19 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,1 filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company. (Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Wed 05/08 11:05 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 05/07 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company, identifying AGC Life Insurance Company, AIG Life Holdings, Inc., Corebridge Financial, Inc. (f/k/a SAFG Retirement Services, Inc.), American International Group, Inc. (AIG), The Vanguard Group. (Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 05/07 1:48 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company. (Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 05/07 1:45 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37423740 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff American General Life Insurence Company. (Attorney Randi Perry Spallina added to party American General Life Insurence Company(pty:pla))(Spallina, Randi)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Application,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Annuity,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Apr. 13, 2012 COB Form,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - May 2, 2014 COB Form,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Mar. 27, 2019 Change of Ownership Form,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Mar. 27, 2019 COB Form,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - Excerpts of Trust Amendment