Colorado District Court
Judge:Kathryn A Starnella
Case #: 1:24-cv-01263
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 1:44 AM MST
Defendant
Stephen Elioff
Represented By
Christina Michelle Gonsalves
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Kyle Jerome
Represented By
Christina Michelle Gonsalves
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Amy Pieterse
Represented By
Christina Michelle Gonsalves
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ron Smits
Represented By
Christina Michelle Gonsalves
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
WS Barricade Corporation
Represented By
Christina Michelle Gonsalves
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
William A. Rogers, III
Dietze & Davis, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Wyatt T. Handy, Jr.
P.O. Box 8052
Witchita, KS 67208

GPO Mar 31 2025
ORDER granting 22 Motion to Dismiss. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 3/31/2025. (kaslc2, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
87 87 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/07 10:14 PM
RESPONSE to72 MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify For Leave to File Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 72) filed by Defendants WS Barricade Corporation, Ron Smits, Stephen Elioff, Amy Pieterse, Kyle Jerome. (Gonsalves, Christina)
Related: [-]