Wyoming District Court
Judge:Kelly H Rankin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00093
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Terminated:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Nov 03, 2024 2:28 AM MST
Defendant
Charlie Cheddas' LLC
Represented By
Scott A Homar
The Kuker Group LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Unit-E Global LC
Represented By
Jan I Berlage
Gohn Hankey & Berlage LLP
contact info
Judith A Studer
Schwartz Bon Walker & Studer
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Monday, August 05, 2024
10 10 order Transferring Case Mon 08/05 1:32 PM
ORDER Denying4 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and Transferring Case to the District of Maryland (Baltimore) by the Honorable Kelly H. Rankin. Case Transferred from the District of Wyoming to the District of Maryland (Baltimore). (Court Staff, smxb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
9 9 misc Request for Hearing Wed 07/31 4:42 PM
REQUEST for hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Charlie Cheddas' LLC. (Homar, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
8 8 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/09 1:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to4 MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Plaintiff Unit-E Global LC. (Studer, Judith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance (Pro Hac Vice) Tue 07/02 1:42 PM
Notice of Pro Hac Vice Attorney Appearance by Jan I Berlage on behalf of Unit-E Global LC (Berlage, Jan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time - Dispositive Mon 07/01 3:01 PM
(TEXT-ONLY) ORDER by the District Judge Kelly H Rankin granting5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff has until July 12, 2024, to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Court Staff, sjgc)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Extension of Time (Dispositive) Mon 07/01 11:44 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time (Dispositive) requesting extension of Plaintiff's Response Deadline to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Plaintiff Unit-E Global LC. (Studer, Judith)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Case Tue 06/18 11:59 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Case, filed by Defendant Charlie Cheddas' LLC.(Homar, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Monday, June 10, 2024
misc Financial Entry Mon 06/10 4:45 PM
FINANCIAL ENTRY: $100 Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid Related [+] On Behalf of Jan I. Berlage (Court Staff, stmo)
Related: [-] ceipt #2-3191
Friday, June 07, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 06/07 10:33 AM
ORDER by the District Judge Kelly H Rankin granting2 MOTION to appear pro hac vice admitting Jan I. Berlage for the Plaintiff Unit-E Global LC. Emailed counsel on this date. (Court Staff, smxb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
2 2 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/06 4:39 PM
MOTION for Jan I. Berlage to appear pro hac vice; Check not tendered; filed by Plaintiff Unit-E Global LC.(Studer, Judith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit of Jan I. Berlage,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 of Affidavit,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 05/07 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT ( 1 summons issued) with Jury Demand. ( Filing fee $405 receipt #CAS 1-486.) filed by Unit E-Global LC. (Court Staff, stbd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet