California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Charles Novack
Case #: 4:24-bk-40686
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Jun 12, 2024
Terminated:Jun 26, 2024

Debtor
PAYLESS FURNITURE & MATTRESS, INC
6029 Shawcroft Dr
San Jose, CA 95123-4244
Represented By
Michael Chinh Vu
Vusa Law Offices
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Paul Mansdorf
1569 Solano Ave. #703
Berkeley, CA 94707
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee/Oak
Office of the United States Trustee Phillip J. Burton Federal Building 450 Golden Gate Ave. 5th Fl., #05-0153
San Francisco, CA 94102


Docket last updated: 05/08/2024 12:02 AM PDT
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
crditcrd none Tue 05/07 4:14 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)([LINK 24-40686 ) [misc,volp7] ( 338.00). Receipt number A33173728, amount $ 338.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)
1 1 misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) Tue 05/07 4:12 PM
Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $338. Filed by PAYLESS FURNITURE & MATTRESS, INC. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 05/21/2024. (Vu, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 7 (Business No Asset) Tue 05/07 4:30 PM
Meeting of Creditors and Appointment of Interim Trustee Paul Mansdorf with 341(a) meeting to be held on 6/12/2024 at 10:30 AM via Zoom Trustee - Mansdorf: Meeting ID 954 489 7199, Passcode 6761511473, Phone 1-510-585-4344. (Scheduled Automatic Assignment)
Related: [-]