New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00594
Case Filed:May 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday May 08, 2024 1:43 AM MDT
Defendant
Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (1)
Represented By
Francisco Valcarcel
Federal Public Defender For The District Of New Mexico
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Laura Garibay
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Silvia Teresa Delgado
United States Attorney'S Office - District Of New Mexic
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/08/2024 8:33 PM MST
Monday, March 25, 2024
Arrest of Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (kls) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
Hearing as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar: Initial Appearance set for 3/26/2024 at 09:08 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (kls) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar. Attorney Silvia Teresa Delgado for USA added. (ac) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Garibay, Laura) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
1 1 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar. (ac) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Francisco Valcarcel for Sergio Bucio-Cuellar by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Initial Appearance as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar held on 3/26/2024. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Randy Castellano; AFPD: David Benatar ; FPD Standing In; Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:33 AM - 9:38 AM. Time In Session: 9:43 AM - 9:49 AM. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea for 3/29/2024, at 09:01 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ac) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
6 6 WAIVER of Hearings by Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (Valcarcel, Francisco) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ac) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
8 8 3 pgs ORDER OF DETENTION as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar by Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea (ac) [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar: Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/6/2024 at 01:30 PM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (vrr) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-00441-KRS]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
10 10 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been reassigned to District Judge Margaret I. Strickland. The first page of each document must have the case file number and initials of the assigned judge. Accordingly, further documents filed in this matter must bear the case number and the judge's initials shown in the case caption and the NEF for this document. Kindly reflect this change in your filings. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to this case. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vrr)
Related: [-]
11 11 1 pgs INFORMATION as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (1) count(s) 1. (vh)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (vh)
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (vh)
Related: [-]
14 14 9 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (vh)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Plea Hearing as to Sergio Bucio-Cuellar held on 5/6/2024, Plea entered by Sergio Bucio-Cuellar (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (Interpreter: Marcela Renna) (vh)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca