1
|
|
1
Sealed Complaint as to Juan Mercado (1). Violations of 18 U.S.C. §§ 666 and 1951. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave) (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
LETTER by USA as to Juan Mercado addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Catherine Ghosh / Jerry Fang / Sheb Swett / Meredith Foster / Jacob Fiddelman dated 2/5/24 re: Unsealing. Document filed by USA. Document filed by USA. (vb) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Arrest of Juan Mercado. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Attorney update in case as to Juan Mercado. Attorney Harvey Fishbein for Juan Mercado added. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave: Initial Appearance as to Juan Mercado held on 2/6/2024. Bond Hearing as to Juan Mercado held on 2/6/2024. Defendant present with CJA Harvey Fishbein. AUSA Jerry Fang present. BAIL DISPOSITION: Agreed conditions of release; $100,000 Personal recognizance bond; Cosigned by one financially responsible person; Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Pretrial supervision as directed by Pretrial Services; Deft not to possess firearm, destructive device, other weapon; 1. Def. may not communicate directly or indirectly with any person he knows or has reason to believe is a current or former NYCHA contractor either about work at NYCHA or about this case unless in the presence of counsel.2. Def. represented that he has surrendered all firearms and firearm license. Deft to be released on own signature; Remaining conditions to be met by 2/20/24. ***Preliminary Hearing Date: 3/7/24. On defendant's consent. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Juan Mercado. Harvey Fishbein appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave) (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
Appearance Bond Entered as to Juan Mercado: $100,000 personal recognizance bond; Co-signed by one financially responsible person by February 20, 2024; Additional conditions... (jbo) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/22/2024) (job). [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER as to Juan Mercado. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed (1) to unseal the complaints in each of the cases listed in Exhibit A to the Governments February 5, 2024 letter and file them on the public docket, and (2) to file this Order and the Governments February 5, 2024 letter and its three Exhibits on the public docket of each of those cases. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 2/6/24)(vb) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Juan Mercado. Time excluded from 3/4/24 until 4/8/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 3/4/24)(jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Juan Mercado re:8 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jbo) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Juan Mercado. Time excluded from 4/5/2024 until 5/8/2024.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Robyn F. Tarnofsky on 4/5/2024)(job) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
AFFIRMATION of AUSA Jacob R. Fiddelman in Support by USA as to Juan Mercado re:10 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (job) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Juan Mercado. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
ORDER as to Juan Mercado: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing in this matter will be held on Monday, May 6, 2024, at 2:30 P.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Arraignment/Change of Plea Hearing set for 5/6/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/1/2024) (lnl) [1:24-mj-00495-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni:Arraignment as to Juan Mercado (1) Count 1 held on 5/6/2024. Defendant appears with counsel Harvey Fishbein and Akane Fujiwara; AUSA Fang is also present. Consistent with the requirements of Fed. R. Crim. P 5(f) in the presence of Defendant, the AUSA was orally reminded of his obligations uner the Constitution to disclose exculpatory evidence to the Defense. Defendant waived indictment. Plea entered by Juan Mercado (1) Guilty as to Count 1., as to Juan Mercado. The Court accepted the plea. PSI ordered. Bail continued. ( Submissions due by 9/17/2024., Sentencing set for 10/1/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Court Reporter Amy Walker) (jm) Modified on 5/6/2024 (jm).
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Juan Mercado. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF as to Juan Mercado. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Juan Mercado (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Juan Mercado. (jm)
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
ORDER as to Juan Mercado. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendant will be sentenced on Tuesday, October 1, 2024, at 2:30 P.M. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse,located at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. Pre-sentencing submissions are due September 17, 2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No 116182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020), to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations (Sentencing set for 10/1/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/6/24)(jw)
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Harvey Fishbein dated 5/6/24 re: Temporary Bail Modification ., MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Juan Mercado. (Fishbein, Harvey)
Related: [-]
|