Original Case: 1:11-cv-00483

Sixth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-01403
Typecivil / private / federal question
Nature of Suit893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters
Case Filed:May 07, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday May 13, 2025 5:36 AM CDT
Defendant
NCR CORPORATION
Defendant
WEYERHAEUSER COMPANY
Defendant - Appellant
INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY, INC.
Represented By
David William Centner
Clark Hill
contact info
Scott C. Holbrook
BakerHostetler
contact info
Hallie Rebecca Israel
BakerHostetler
contact info
John Daniel Parker Jr.
BakerHostetler
contact info
Ryan David Fischbach
Baker & Hostetler
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGIA-PACIFIC CONSUMER PRODUCTS LP
Represented By
Douglas M. Garrou
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
George Peter Sibley III
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Matthew J. Rubenstein
Jones Day
contact info
John Henry Thompson
Jones Day
contact info
Michael R. Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Noel John Francisco
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
FORT JAMES CORPORATION
Represented By
Douglas M. Garrou
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
George Peter Sibley III
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Matthew J. Rubenstein
Jones Day
contact info
John Henry Thompson
Jones Day
contact info
Michael R. Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Noel John Francisco
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC
Represented By
Douglas M. Garrou
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
George Peter Sibley III
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Jeffrey Pierce Lamberson
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Amanda Kelly Rice
Jones Day
contact info
Matthew J. Rubenstein
Jones Day
contact info
John Henry Thompson
Jones Day
contact info
Michael R. Shebelskie
Hunton Andrews Kurth
contact info
Noel John Francisco
Jones Day
contact info

GPO May 12 2025
OPINION and JUDGMENT filed : VACATED and REMANDED. Mandate to issue. Decision for publication. Karen Nelson Moore, Julia Smith Gibbons, and Raymond M. Kethledge (AUTHORING), Circuit Judges. [24-1403, 24-1404]

Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 5:36 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
The case manager for this case is: Antoinette Macon (ASM)
Related: [-]
3 pgs Civil Case Docketed. Notice filed by Appellant International Paper Company, Inc.. Transcript needed: y. (ASM)
Related: [-]