California Central District Court
Judge:Sherilyn Peace Garnett
Referred: Rozella A Oliver
Case #: 2:24-cv-03821
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Terminated:Apr 09, 2025
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 12:37 AM PST
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
Represented By
Ashleigh Kathleen Gideon
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Robert A Shields
Wilson Turner Kosmo LLP
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Mediator (ADR Panel)
James Burgess
Represented By
James M Burgess
Burgess Law Corporation
contact info
Plaintiff
Armand Manoukian
Represented By
Jim O Whitworth
Law Offices Of Jim O Whitworth
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
23 23 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Wed 04/09 10:05 AM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. The parties filed a stipulation of dismissal21 , which is effective to close to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The case is therefore closed. Accordingly, the Court strikes the proposed order, as moot, and all pending dates are vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 04/09 9:32 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Motion to Dismiss21 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or untimely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
21 21 motion Dismiss Case Mon 04/07 1:01 PM
Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 03/14 4:27 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE and ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. At the request of counsel and with the Court's approval, the Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal is continued to April 9, 2025, at 1:30 pm. Counsel is ordered to file a status report by April 7, 2025. If a dismissal is filed, counsel does not need to file the status report. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 02/18 1:53 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: On February 5, 2025, A Mediation Report was filed at ECF No.18 stating settlement reached by the parties. The Court sets an Order to Show Cause re Dismissal for March 19, 2025 at 1:30 p.m. If the parties file a dismissal by March 17, 2025, the matter will be taken off calendar and no appearance by counsel will be required. All pending dates are vacated. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
18 18 adr Mediation Report (ADR-3) Completely Settled Wed 02/05 10:00 PM
MEDIATION REPORT Filed by Mediator (ADR Panel) James Burgess: Mediation held on January 24, 2025 and the case has been completely settled. With the filing of this Report, the parties are advised that they must notify the trial judge's deputy courtroom clerk of the fact of settlement and to promptly file documents regarding the final disposition of the case. Counsel: Please evaluate the effectiveness of the ADR Program by completing a survey on your mediation experience. To access the survey, click on the following link:[LINK:MediationParticipantSurvey] (Burgess, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
17 17 adr Notice of Mediation Date (ADR-13) Fri 09/13 7:48 AM
NOTICE OF MEDIATION DATE filed. Mediation set for January 29, 2025.(Burgess, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
16 16 adr Notice of Assignment of Panel Mediator (ADR-11) - optional html form Thu 08/08 7:27 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) James Burgess has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
15 15 12 pgs order Order Tue 06/18 12:39 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (iv)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Pretrial-Trial Scheduling Order - form only Tue 06/18 12:38 PM
CIVIL PRETRIAL SCHEDULE AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2025 at 3:00 PM. Jury Trial set for 6/9/2025 at 8:30 AM. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (iv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates Worksheet
13 13 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Tue 06/18 12:34 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 4/16/2025. (iv)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 06/18 11:20 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett: The Court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the Court VACATES the June 26, 2024, Scheduling Conference. Trial Order to be issued. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
11 11 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Wed 06/12 2:05 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 7 court days, filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc... (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 05/14 2:21 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/12/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2024 at 03:00 PM before Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 05/14 2:17 PM
STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett. (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 05/13 4:51 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 05/13 4:50 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 05/13 4:49 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sherilyn Peace Garnett and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Wed 05/08 10:22 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc., re Notice (Other)4 , Notice (Other)3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/08 10:19 AM
Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/08 10:18 AM
Notice of Jury Demand filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Wed 05/08 10:15 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 05/08 10:11 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 24STCV02328 Receipt No: ACACDC-37428773 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Attorney Ashleigh Kathleen Gideon added to party Porsche Cars North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gideon, Ashleigh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Certification of Service
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 05/13 4:19 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Armand Manoukian in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/29/2024, attached to Gideon Decl. as Exhibit A. (jtil)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 05/13 4:27 PM
CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc., attached to Gideon Decl. as Exhibit B.(jtil)
Related: [-]