Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Rebecca Grady Jennings
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00277
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:May 08, 2024
Case in other court:Jefferson Circuit Court, 24-CI-002457
Last checked: Monday Nov 04, 2024 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Lt. Col. Jerry Collins
Represented By
James Eugene McKiernan, III
Jefferson County Attorney Office
contact info
Defendant
Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government
Represented By
James Eugene McKiernan, III
Jefferson County Attorney Office
contact info
Defendant
Officer Juan Ochoa
Represented By
James Eugene McKiernan, III
Jefferson County Attorney Office
contact info
Defendant
Officer Saja Salman
Represented By
James Eugene McKiernan, III
Jefferson County Attorney Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Chaprecious Trabue
Represented By
Shaun A. Wimberly, Sr.
Wimberly & Associates, PLLC
contact info

GPO Dec 10 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/10/2024. Defendants' motion to dismiss (DE 6), which the Court construes as a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings, is GRANTED. Trabue's official-capacity claims against Salman, Ochoa, and Collins are DISMISSED. Trabue's state-law claims, to the extent they are claims directly against Louisville Metro, are DISMISSED. Trabue's Section 1983 claims against Louisville Metro and the individual-capacity defendants, as well as her state-law claims against the individual-capacity defendants, remain. cc: Counsel (SMJ)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 04/10 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Erin C. Farnham on behalf of Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman (Farnham, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
18 18 minutes Status Conference Thu 03/20 1:57 PM
ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Status Conference held on 3/17/2025. Telephonic Status Conference set for 5/20/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the Parties shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-650-479-3207 and entering access code 2319 759 1660. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
17 17 order Order - TEXT ONLY Wed 03/05 4:31 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 3/5/2025. Upon request of counsel and by agreement of the parties, the 3/6/2025 telephonic status conference is REMANED and RESCHEDULED for 3/17/2025 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the Parties shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-650-479-3207 and entering access code 2319 759 1660. Attendees should press # to skip entry of an attendee or host code. Counsel is advised that the Court is setting this conference telephonically as a convenience to and cost-saving measure for the Parties. But the telephonic conference is still a court proceeding for which the Court expects counsel to appear on time. Counsel is cautioned that non-appearance may result in the proceeding being rescheduled for an in-person conference that client representatives must attend and/or the issuance of sanctions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(f). This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel (TLB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 12/10 4:34 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 12/10/2024. Defendants' motion to dismiss (DE6 ), which the Court construes as a motion for partial judgment on the pleadings, is GRANTED. Trabue's official-capacity claims against Salman, Ochoa, and Collins are DISMISSED. Trabue's state-law claims, to the extent they are claims directly against Louisville Metro, are DISMISSED. Trabue's Section 1983 claims against Louisville Metro and the individual-capacity defendants, as well as her state-law claims against the individual-capacity defendants, remain. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
15 15 minutes Status Conference Thu 12/05 9:18 AM
ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/4/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 3/6/2025 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the Parties shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-650-479-3207 and entering access code 2319 759 1660. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
14 14 misc Status Report Tue 11/26 12:49 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman, Jerry Collins. (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
13 13 minutes Scheduling Conference Thu 08/01 4:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/29/2024. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosure due by 9/30/2024. Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 10/30/2024. All Fact Discovery due by 8/20/2025. Expert Witness (Plaintiff) due by 9/15/2025. Expert Witness (Defendant) due by 11/17/2025. All Expert Discovery due by 1/16/2026. Joint Status Report due by 11/27/2024. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/4/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel for the parties shall connect to the conference by dialing toll free number 1-888-808-6929 and entering access code 2773744#. Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 3/13/2026. Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2026 at 1:30 PM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings (*see order for pretrial filing requirements). Jury Trial set for 10/19/2026 at 9:30 AM in Louisville Courtroom before Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. cc: Counsel (TIC :15) (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Litigation Plan) Fri 07/12 3:39 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman. (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
11 11 4 pgs order Order Wed 06/12 4:19 PM
ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT (EBOC) by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 6/11/2024. Telephonic Rule 16 Case-Management Conference set for 7/29/2024 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay. Counsel shall connect to the conference by dialing 1-888-808-6929, access code 2773744. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
10 10 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 06/12 2:27 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman. (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
9 9 respm Response to Motion Thu 06/06 8:18 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Chaprecious Trabue. (Wimberly, Shaun)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
8 8 order Order - TEXT ONLY Wed 06/05 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 6/5/2024; pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), this matter is REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay for resolution of all litigation planning issues, a scheduling conference, entry of scheduling orders, consideration of amendments thereto, and resolution of all non-dispositive matters, including discovery issues. Magistrate Judge Lindsay is further authorized to conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. A separate order scheduling the Rule 16 Conference will be issued by the Chambers of United States Magistrate Judge Lindsay.Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), and in accordance with Rule 73(b)(1) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. You may consent to have your case referred to a magistrate judge, or you may withhold your consent without adverse consequences. Should all parties consent to having a United States magistrate judge conduct all proceedings in this case, please complete the Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge (https://www.kywd.uscourts.gov/sites/kywd/files/forms/ao085-1-Notice-Consent.pdf) and send a copy of this document to the clerks office via regular mail or email at intake-kywECF@kywd.uscourts.gov. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc:counsel,CM-CHL. (ARM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 05/16 10:09 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman. (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 05/16 10:07 AM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 10, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Proposed Agreed Order Fri 05/10 10:42 AM
AGREED ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Signed by Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings on 5/9/2024 granting4 Proposed Agreed Order. Defendants shall have until 5/16/2024 to file responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's Complaint and such shall be deemed timely filed. cc: Counsel (SMJ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
4 4 motion Proposed Agreed Order Wed 05/08 4:28 PM
Proposed Agreed Order for Extension of Time by Jerry Collins, Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Juan Ochoa, Saja Salman. (McKiernan, James)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/08 1:56 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE to Jefferson Circuit Court re1 Notice of Removal. cc: Counsel of Record, Jefferson Circuit Court (HMC)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Wed 05/08 1:39 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Rebecca Grady Jennings. (HMC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 05/08 1:38 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Louisville-Jefferson County Metro Government, Jerry Collins, Juan Ochoa and Saja Salman from Jefferson Circuit Court, case number 24-CI-002457. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AKYWDC-4029105) (HMC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit #1 - State Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit #2 - State Court Pleadings,
Att: 3 Cover Sheet